Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994788

EP0994788 - ELONGATED FISH-PLATE FOR JOINING TWO ELONGATED CONDUCTOR RAILS AND PAIR OF CONDUCTOR RAILS JOINED BY SUCH A FISH-PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.03.2003  [2003/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / JENTZSCH, Peter
Heinrich-Zille-Strasse 17
D-16540 Hohen Neuendorf / DE
02 / STOLLE, Rüdiger
Karmeliterweg 84
D-13465 Berlin / DE
03 / AXMANN, Michael
7 McDonald Str.
RR1 Dover Centre, NOP 1LO Ontario / CA
[2000/17]
Application number, filing date98936258.726.06.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998DE01774
Priority number, dateDE199712941509.07.1997         Original published format: DE 19729415
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9902364
Date:21.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994788
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994788
Date:27.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60M1/30, E01B11/04
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2000/17]
TitleGerman:LÄNGLICHE VERBINDUNGSLASCHE ZUM VERBINDEN ZWEIER LÄNGLICHER BAHNSTROMSCHIENEN UND MIT DERARTIGER VERBINDUNGSLASCHE VERBUNDENES PAAR VON BAHNSTROMSCHIENEN[2000/17]
English:ELONGATED FISH-PLATE FOR JOINING TWO ELONGATED CONDUCTOR RAILS AND PAIR OF CONDUCTOR RAILS JOINED BY SUCH A FISH-PLATE[2000/17]
French:ECLISSE DE FORME ALLONGEE POUR LE RACCORDEMENT DE RAILS CONDUCTEURS ALLONGES, ET PAIRE DE RAILS CONDUCTEURS RACCORDEE PAR UNE TELLE ECLISSE[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase17.12.1999National basic fee paid 
17.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/17]
11.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2001Fee for grant paid
05.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]JPS57155125  ;
 [Y]US3699275  (MAYO CECIL J, et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 3, line 18 - column 3, line 44; figure 3 *;
 [A]FR2468691  (DELACHAUX C [FR]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821218), vol. 6, no. 260, Database accession no. (M - 180), [Y] 1-5 * abstract *