Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975491

EP0975491 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING MOTOR VEHICLE TILT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.07.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / LEIMBACH, Klaus-Dieter
Haldenweg 45
D-71696 Möglingen / DE
[2000/05]
Application number, filing date98936264.530.06.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998DE01793
Priority number, dateDE199715183922.11.1997         Original published format: DE 19751839
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9926810
Date:03.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975491
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975491
Date:24.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60R16/02
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG EINER KIPPTENDENZ EINES FAHRZEUGES[2000/05]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING MOTOR VEHICLE TILT[2000/05]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DETECTER LA TENDANCE AU BASCULEMENT D'UN VEHICULE[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase23.08.1999National basic fee paid 
23.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
01.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2003Fee for grant paid
24.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR24.09.2003
SE24.12.2003
[2006/14]
Former [2004/16]SE24.12.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0330149  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4023864  (LANG THOMAS J, et al) [X] 1-6,10,11 * column 3, line 12 - column 7, line 19; figures 1-6 *;
 [Y]US5446658  (PASTOR STEPHEN R [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE4228893  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2257403  (GLOSTER SARO LTD [GB]) [A] 1,2,5,8,10 * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 8 * * page 5, line 11 - page 7, line 15 * * page 8, line 11 - page 9, line 4; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]FR2425342  (SAINT MARCEL STE METALLURG [FR]) [A] 1,2,5,8,10 * the whole document *
by applicantDE4416991