Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968100

EP0968100 - INSIDE LIGHT MODULE WITH A RAIN SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  06.10.2006
Database last updated on 22.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 21.05.2008  [2008/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valeo Wischersysteme GmbH
Poststrässle 10
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
[2004/07]
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
Valeo Auto-Electric Wischer und Motoren GmbH
Stuttgarter Strasse 119
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
ITT MANUFACTURING ENTERPRISES, INC.
1105 North Market Street, Suite 1217
Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SINN, Alexandra
Rauhhalde 24 Bieringen
D-74214 Schöntal / DE
02 / BAYHA, Heiner
Wernerstrasse 17
D-71739 Oberriexingen / DE
03 / PHILIPPS, Werner
Egerländer Strasse 6
D-71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Croonenbroek, Thomas Jakob
Innovincia
11, avenue des Tilleuls
74200 Thonon-les-Bains / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/21]Croonenbroek, Thomas Jakob
InnoVinciA 7 Place des Arts
74200 Thonon-les-Bains / FR
Former [2006/44]Croonenbroek, Thomas Jakob
InnoVinciA 7, chemin du Vuard Marchat
F-74200 Thonon les Bains / FR
Former [2004/07]Croonenbroek, Thomas
Valeo Switches & Detection Systems (VSDS) Service Propriété Industrielle Rue Jules Verne - Vetraz Monthoux, B.P. 509
74106 Annemasse Cedex / FR
Former [2001/15]Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker
Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2000/01]Steimle, Josef, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Gerokstrasse 6
70188 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date98936276.919.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998EP01625
Priority number, dateDE199711137419.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19711374
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9843852
Date:08.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0968100
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968100
Date:16.10.2002
Language:DE
[2002/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:B60R16/00
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/01]
TitleGerman:INNENLICHTMODUL MIT REGENSENSOR[2000/01]
English:INSIDE LIGHT MODULE WITH A RAIN SENSOR[2000/01]
French:MODULE D'ECLAIRAGE INTERIEUR DOTE D'UN DETECTEUR DE PLUIE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase30.07.1999National basic fee paid 
30.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
05.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.07.2002Fee for grant paid
05.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.07.2003   
Leopold Kostal GmbH & Co. KG
D-58505 Lüdenscheid / DE
 [2003/37]
16.09.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.01.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.11.2004Date of oral proceedings
28.12.2004Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.12.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
21.09.2006Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/45]
Appeal following opposition14.02.2005Appeal received No.  T0239/05
09.05.2005Statement of grounds filed
21.09.2006Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE4329983  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-6,8,9 * the whole document * [Y] 7;
 [YA]US4871917  (O'FARRELL DESMOND J [US], et al) [Y] 7 * figures 1,18-20 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 56 * * column 11, line 20 - column 12, line 10 * [A] 1-6,8,9