Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990104

EP0990104 - CATALYTIC BURNER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / RÖLTGEN, Uli
Im Nussbaumboden 11
D-79397 Müllheim / DE
02 / SCHULER, Alexander
Adlerstrasse 13
D-79098 Freiburg / DE
03 / KANAL, Herwig
Gerberan 36
D-79098 Freiburg / DE
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
Former [2000/14]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner
Kurfürstendamm 170
10707 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date98936347.817.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998EP03607
Priority number, dateDE199712664518.06.1997         Original published format: DE 19726645
[2000/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858208
Date:23.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990104
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:F23C11/00, F23D14/18
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:KATALYTISCHER BRENNER[2000/14]
English:CATALYTIC BURNER[2000/14]
French:BRULEUR CATALYTIQUE[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase22.10.1999National basic fee paid 
22.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
23.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/21]
19.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0256322  (VIANI UMBERTO) [X] 1,2,3,5,6,9,12,13 [A] 8,10,11;
 [A]DE19542706  (BUDERUS HEIZTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 16