EP0993308 - STENTS COATED WITH FLUOROALKYL GROUPS, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME AND THE USE THEREOF IN THE PROPHYLAXIS OF RESTENOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft 13342 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAUSE, Werner Turmfalkenstrasse 39a D-13505 Berlin / DE | 02 /
HÖCKER, Hartwig Am Dorbach 23 D-52076 Aachen / DE | 03 /
KLEE, Doris Preusweg 64 D-52074 Aachen / DE | 04 /
LAHANN, Jörg Grosswaldstr. 31 D-66571 Habach / DE | [2000/26] |
Former [2000/16] | 01 /
KRAUSE, Werner Turmfalkenstrasse 39a D-13505 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 98936352.8 | 18.06.1998 | [2000/16] | WO1998EP03627 | Priority number, date | DE1997127838 | 24.06.1997 Original published format: DE 19727838 | [2000/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9858680 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0993308 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0993308 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/00 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
A61L33/0076 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L31/10, C08L101/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/16] | A61L2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/16] | Title | German: | MIT FLUORALKYLGRUPPEN BESCHICHTETE STENTS, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR RESTENOSEPROPHYLAXE | [2000/16] | English: | STENTS COATED WITH FLUOROALKYL GROUPS, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME AND THE USE THEREOF IN THE PROPHYLAXIS OF RESTENOSIS | [2000/16] | French: | EXTENSEURS RECOUVERTS DE GROUPES FLUOROALKYLE, LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR LA PROPHYLAXIE DE LA RESTENOSE | [2000/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 20.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 21.07.2004 | IE | 21.07.2004 | IT | 21.07.2004 | NL | 21.07.2004 | DK | 21.10.2004 | GR | 21.10.2004 | SE | 21.10.2004 | ES | 01.11.2004 | PT | 21.12.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/24] | FI | 21.07.2004 | |
IE | 21.07.2004 | ||
NL | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 21.07.2004 | |
IE | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 21.07.2004 | |
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 21.07.2004 | |
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 21.07.2004 | |
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 21.07.2004 | |
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 21.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3918736 (VALLBRACHT CHRISTIAN DR [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0519087 (HEWLETT PACKARD GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 32 * * page 4, line 3 - line 12 * * page 6, line 35 - page 7, line 36 *; | [A]US5607475 (CAHALAN LINDA L [NL], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1 - column 4, line 55 *; | [E]DE29711398U (SCHERING AG [DE]) [E] 1-9* the whole document * |