Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993436

EP0993436 - (S) 2-METHYLAMINO-2-PHENYL-N-BUTYL 3,4,5-TRIMETHOXYBENZOATE, ITS APPLICATION TO THE TREATMENT OF CHRONIC PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/16](S) 2-METHYLAMINO-2-PHENYL-$i(n)-BUTYL 3,4,5-TRIMETHOXYBENZOATE, ITS APPLICATION TO THE TREATMENT OF CHRONIC PAIN
[2000/30]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.06.2002
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PARKE-DAVIS
10, Avenue de l'Arche
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DAHL, Svein, G.
45, allée de la Pièce de Terre
F-91190 Gif sur Yvette / FR
02 / JACOBELLI, Henry
65, avenue du Général de Gaulle
F-91550 Paray-Vieille-Poste / FR
03 / GROUHEL, Agnès
2, rue des Peupliers
F-92190 Meudon / FR
04 / ROMAN, François, Joseph
11, allée Pierre-Fresnay
F-94400 Vitry-sur-Seine / FR
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Mansmann, Ivo , et al
Warner-Lambert Company Patent Department, c/o Gödeke AG Mooswaldallee 1-9
79090 Freiburg / DE
[2009/31]
Former [2000/16]Mansmann, Ivo , et al
Warner-Lambert Company, Legal Division, Patent Department, c/o Gödecke AG
79090 Freiburg / DE
Application number, filing date98936382.523.06.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998EP03825
Priority number, dateFR1997000832330.06.1997         Original published format: FR 9708323
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9901417
Date:14.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993436
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07C219/14, A61K31/135
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
Extension statesAL31.01.2000
LT31.01.2000
LV31.01.2000
MK31.01.2000
RO31.01.2000
SI31.01.2000
TitleGerman:(S) 2-METHYLAMINO-2-PHENYL-N-BUTYL 3,4,5-TRIMETHOXYBENZOAT UND SEINE VERWENDUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG CHRONISCHER SCHMERZEN[2000/16]
English:(S) 2-METHYLAMINO-2-PHENYL-N-BUTYL 3,4,5-TRIMETHOXYBENZOATE, ITS APPLICATION TO THE TREATMENT OF CHRONIC PAIN[2000/30]
French:(S) 2-METHYLAMINO-2-PHENYL-N-BUTYLE 3,4,5-TRIMETHOXYBENZOATE ET SON UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR CHRONIQUE[2000/30]
Former [2000/16](S) 2-METHYLAMINO-2-PHENYL-$i(n)-BUTYL 3,4,5-TRIMETHOXYBENZOATE, ITS APPLICATION TO THE TREATMENT OF CHRONIC PAIN
Former [2000/16](S) 2-METHYLAMINO-2-PHENYL-$i(n)-BUTYLE 3,4,5-TRIMETHOXYBENZOATE ET SON UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR CHRONIQUE
Entry into regional phase31.01.2000National basic fee paid 
31.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
18.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
10.06.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[DA]GB1434826  (GALLARDO ANTONIO SA) [DA] 1,4 * page 4, line 21 - line 26; example 19; claims 3,14 *
 [A]  - Y. MIURA ET AL, "Metabolism of trimebutine maleate, a gastrointestinal tract motility regulator in rats and mice. Characterization and quantification of metabolites in urine, bile and plasma", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890213), vol. 110, no. 7, Database accession no. 50644y, XP002057273 [A] 1 * abstract *
    [] - YAKUGAKU ZASSHI, (1988), vol. 108, no. 10, pages 989 - 1000,