Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993380

EP0993380 - HANDLING UNIT, ESPECIALLY INSERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.09.2002
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.10.2002  [2002/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pitney Bowes Technologies GmbH
Grüner Weg 8
61169 Friedberg / DE
[2001/51]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Bell & Howell GmbH
Grüner Weg 8
61169 Friedberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / STING, Martin
Oberlindau 77
D-60323 Frankfurt / DE
02 / BRAUNEIS, Axel
Kirchgasse 30
D-35516 Münzenberg / DE
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro
Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date98936410.406.07.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998EP04165
Priority number, dateDE199712867204.07.1997         Original published format: DE 19728672
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9901295
Date:14.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993380
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993380
Date:07.11.2001
Language:DE
[2001/45]
Search report(s)International search reportEP14.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:B43M3/04
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2000/16]
TitleGerman:HANDHABUNGSSTATION, INSBESONDERE KUVERTIEREINRICHTUNG[2000/16]
English:HANDLING UNIT, ESPECIALLY INSERTER[2000/16]
French:POSTE DE MANIPULATION, NOTAMMENT DISPOSITIF A METTRE SOUS ENVELOPPE[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase23.08.1999National basic fee paid 
23.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
19.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.03.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2001Fee for grant paid
02.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.08.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9220532  (BELL & HOWELL CO [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [DA]DE4116708  (BELL & HOWELL CO [DE]) [DA] 1;
 [A]US4955185  (HAAS DAVE [US], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *;
 [A]DE1010869  (ERNST W KUMMER) [A] 1 * page 3, line 8 - page 5, line 46; figure - *
by applicantDE4116708
 DE19500746