Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995175

EP0995175 - METHOD FOR MANAGING A SECURE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.10.2010
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.12.2010  [2010/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEMPLUS
Avenue du Pic de Bertagne, Parc d'Activités de Gémenos, BP 100
13881 Gémenos Cédex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/14]For all designated states
GEMPLUS
Avenue du Pic de Bertagne, Parc d'Activités de Gémenos, BP 100
13881 Gémenos Cédex / FR
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
GEMPLUS S.C.A.
Avenue du Pic de Bertagne, Parc d'Activités de Gémenos, Boite postale 100
13881 Gémenos Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / JEAN, Lionel
12, rue des Bons Amis
F-13012 Marseille / FR
02 / OUVRAY, Jean, Claude
La Petite Chartreuse,17, avenue Standal
F-13009 Marseille / FR
[2000/17]
Application number, filing date98936471.608.07.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998FR01464
Priority number, dateFR1997000881310.07.1997         Original published format: FR 9708813
[2000/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9903074
Date:21.01.1999
Language:FR
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995175
Date:26.04.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:G07F7/10
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:VERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN GESICHERTES ENDGERÄT[2000/17]
English:METHOD FOR MANAGING A SECURE TERMINAL[2000/17]
French:PROCEDE DE GESTION D'UN TERMINAL SECURISE[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase10.02.2000National basic fee paid 
10.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
04.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/48]
12.07.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/48]
Request for further processing for:05.02.2001Request for further processing filed
05.02.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.02.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
28.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
27.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
26.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
31.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
26.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
31.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
02.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
Cited inInternational search[YA]EP0157303  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 1,2,10,12 * abstract * * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 25 * [A] 3;
 [YA]FR2674647  (WIDMER MICHEL [FR]) [Y] 1,2,10,12 * abstract * * page 9, line 16 - page 11, line 22 * [A] 5,7,8;
 [A]EP0626662  (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [A] 1,2,4,12 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0696016  (FUJITSU LTD [JP])