Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994661

EP0994661 - METHOD FOR MAKING A FASHION ACCESSORY, DEVICE THEREFOR AND RESULTING FASHION ACCESSORY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.08.2002
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.09.2002  [2002/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Di-Gioia, Bruno
6 bis, rue Haxo
75020 Paris / FR
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Breesé, Pierre
Novagraaf Technologies
122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Breese, Pierre
Breese - Majerowicz 3, avenue de l'Opéra
75001 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98936483.108.07.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998FR01478
Priority number, dateFR1997000867708.07.1997         Original published format: FR 9708677
[2000/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9902062
Date:21.01.1999
Language:FR
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994661
Date:26.04.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:A44C15/00, A44C27/00, D07B7/18
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MODEACCESSOIRES, VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS UND SO HERGESTELLTES MODEACCESSOIRE[2000/17]
English:METHOD FOR MAKING A FASHION ACCESSORY, DEVICE THEREFOR AND RESULTING FASHION ACCESSORY[2000/17]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ACCESSOIRE DE MODE, DISPOSITIF POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCEDE ET ACCESSOIRE DE MODE AINSI REALISE[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase05.01.2000National basic fee paid 
05.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
01.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/38]
05.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US2231485  (VERE STRAIGHT, et al) [A] 1,7 * page 1, column 2, line 23 - page 2, column 1, line 9; figures 1,4 *;
 [A]EP0598363  (KUROSAWA KENSETSU KK [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 3 - line 22; figures 3,4; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE3506290  (URSULA HALL NATUR GOLD UND SIL [DE]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9218741  (PARCO MAST & SUBSTRUCTURES INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4-6 * figures 1,6-8; claims 6-9 *;
 [A]DE9113602U  (REINBOLD) [A] 1,7 * figures 1,2; claim - *;
 [A]FR570384  (BUFFARD) [A] 7,8 * the whole document *