Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1000043 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1000043



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 258
11.08.2010 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.09.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.08.2009 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
27.07.2009 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
27.07.2009 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
21.07.2009 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
16.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
16.07.2009 Description Search / examination 11
16.07.2009 Description Search / examination 11
16.07.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.06.2009 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
12.06.2009 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
28.05.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
28.05.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
28.05.2009 Description Search / examination 1
28.05.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
28.05.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
28.05.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
28.05.2009 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
13.02.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
13.02.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
13.02.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
13.02.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
12.08.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
12.08.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
12.08.2008 Description Search / examination 6
12.08.2008 Description Search / examination 6
12.08.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.08.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
08.08.2008 Description Search / examination 6
08.08.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.04.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.04.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.06.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 10
06.06.2005 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
12.05.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.05.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.04.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 11
07.02.2005 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
26.02.2003 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
25.02.2003 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
27.01.2003 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
16.01.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
15.01.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
04.12.2002 Refund of fees Appeal 1
13.11.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
08.11.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
12.10.2002 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
19.09.2002 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
09.09.2002 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
09.09.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 2
09.09.2002 Means of redress Search / examination 1
19.11.2001 Claims Search / examination 4
19.11.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.11.2001 Description Search / examination 1
19.11.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.09.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.09.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.09.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.05.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
16.05.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.07.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
04.07.2000 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 8
05.04.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.03.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
13.03.2000 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 9
13.03.2000 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 5
20.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
18.10.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
08.10.1999 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
04.05.1999 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
30.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
24.03.1999 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.03.1999 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.03.1999 Priority document Search / examination 16
05.02.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
03.02.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
03.02.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 17