Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1000116 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1000116



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 181
04.08.2004 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
04.12.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 20
11.11.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
02.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
25.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
01.08.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.07.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 12
21.07.2003 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
16.05.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.05.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.05.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
12.05.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
15.10.2002 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
15.10.2002 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
23.09.2002 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
16.07.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
03.07.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
29.05.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
23.05.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
23.05.2002 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
23.05.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 2
30.03.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
30.03.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.03.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
27.02.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
27.02.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.01.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
28.01.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.01.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
07.12.2001 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
07.12.2001 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
20.01.2001 Claims Search / examination 3
20.01.2001 Description Search / examination 1
20.01.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.01.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
29.11.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.11.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.11.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.08.2000 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
02.08.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.04.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.01.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
28.09.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 16
30.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.03.1999 Priority document Search / examination 28
02.02.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
02.02.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 22