Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0999864

EP0999864 - Injection device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/20]IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO INJECTION DEVICES
[2003/32]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.12.2004
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.12.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.02.2005  [2005/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ARES TRADING S.A.
Chateau de Vaumarcus
CH-2028 Vaumarcus / CH
[2000/41]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
OWEN MUMFORD LIMITED
Brook Hill
Woodstock, Oxford OX20 1TU / GB
Inventor(s)01 / WEEKES, Stuart
39 Lakefield Road, Littlemore
Oxford OX4 4LZ / GB
02 / ROLFE, Steven, Mark, Guy
18 Crosslands, Fringford
Bicester, Oxon OX6 9DS / GB
[2000/20]
Representative(s)James, Michael John Gwynne , et al
Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22, Rodney Road Cheltenham
Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/27]James, Michael John Gwynne , et al
Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22, Rodney Road
Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB
Former [2000/20]Lainé, Simon James , et al
Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22, Rodney Road
Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB
Application number, filing date98936554.930.07.1998
[2000/20]
WO1998GB02287
Priority number, dateGB1997001606531.07.1997         Original published format: GB 9716065
[2000/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9906100
Date:11.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/06]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0999864
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999
[2000/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0999864
Date:25.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/20
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/20]
TitleGerman:Injektionsvorrichtung[2003/32]
English:Injection device[2003/32]
French:Dispositif d'injection[2003/32]
Former [2000/20]INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG
Former [2000/20]IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO INJECTION DEVICES
Former [2000/20]AMELIORATIONS CONCERNANT DES DISPOSITIFS D'INJECTION
Entry into regional phase28.02.2000National basic fee paid 
28.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
26.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
17.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
15.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.2003Fee for grant paid
28.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03011335.1  / EP1334739
Opposition(s)26.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07]
Request for further processing for:15.04.2003Request for further processing filed
15.04.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.06.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0666084  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 8, line 7 - line 36; figure - *;
 [A]FR2654938  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]) [A] 1-12 * page 10, line 24 - page 12, line 4; figure - *;
 [A]WO9531235  (WASHINGTON BIOTECH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 4, line 9 - page 7, line 16; figure - *;
 [A]WO8806463  (SECR DEFENCE BRIT [GB]) [A] 10-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3292776  (PENN THOMAS R) [A] 10-12 * column W *;
 [A]FR2623403  (BACCI LOUIS [FR]) [A] 10-12 * the whole document *