Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1050925

EP1050925 - MULTI-PRIMARY RADIATOR, DOWN CONVERTER AND MULTIBEAM ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2012
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.10.2012  [2012/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2011/42]
Former [2008/51]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
Matsushita Electronics Corporation
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TOKUDA, Katsuhiko
5-13-10 Shinkofudai
Toyono-cho
Toyono-gun, Osaka 563-0105 / JP
 [2011/46]
Former [2000/45]01 / TOKUDA, Katsuhiko
5-13-10 Shinkofudai, Toyono-cho
Toyono-gun, Osaka 563-0105 / JP
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/46]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2000/45]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date98936690.107.08.1998
[2000/45]
WO1998JP03519
Priority number, dateJP1998001019622.01.1998         Original published format: JP 1019698
[2000/45]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9938228
Date:29.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1050925
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1050925
Date:16.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.07.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.2004
ClassificationInternational:H01Q13/02
[2004/29]
Former International [2000/45]H01Q19/17, H01Q13/02, H01Q25/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/45]
TitleGerman:MEHRFACH-PRIMÄRSTRAHLER, ABWÄRTSUMSETZER UND MEHRKEULEN-ANTENNE[2011/25]
English:MULTI-PRIMARY RADIATOR, DOWN CONVERTER AND MULTIBEAM ANTENNA[2000/45]
French:ELEMENT RAYONNANT PRIMAIRE MULTIPLE, ADAPTATEUR DE BANDE A LA FREQUENCE INFERIEURE ET ANTENNE MULTIFAISCEAU[2000/45]
Former [2000/45]MEHRFACH-PRIMÄRSTRAHLER ,ABWÄRTSUMETEZER UND MEHRKEULEN-ANTENNE
Entry into regional phase18.07.2000Translation filed 
22.08.2000National basic fee paid 
22.08.2000Search fee paid 
22.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
22.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
05.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2011Fee for grant paid
06.10.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.12.2005
Opposition(s)17.08.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
31.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
31.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
19.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
31.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
31.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
31.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE3829370  (KABELMETAL ELECTRO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7,15-17 * the whole document * [Y] 8-14;
 [X]US3495262  (CLARK ROBERT T) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE4001952  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [X]DE4009322  (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]) [X] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP0350324  (MARCONI CO LTD [GB]) [Y] 8-14 * the whole document *
International search[Y]JPS63184406
 [Y]JPS59185409
 [Y]JPH03155203
 [Y]JPS56141603
 [Y]JPH0936655
 [P]JPH10145138