EP0996400 - INDIVIDUAL PACKAGES FOR ABSORBENT ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMMONS, John, Lee 7379 Dust Commander Court Hamilton, OH 45011 / US | 02 /
BARNES, Ann, Kathleen 4028 Oregon Trail Martinez, GA 30907 / US | 03 /
BERG, Charles, John, Jr. 208 Hillcrest Drive Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US | 04 /
LANDGREBE, Susan, Tepe 7076 Shawnee Hills Drive Cincinnati, OH 45243 / US | [2000/18] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | Kremer, Véronique, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2000/18] | Engisch, Gautier, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 98936898.0 | 17.07.1998 | [2000/18] | WO1998US14882 | Priority number, date | US19970896819 | 18.07.1997 Original published format: US 896819 | [2000/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9903436 | Date: | 28.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0996400 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [2000/18] | CPC: |
A61F13/47227 (EP,KR);
A61F13/5514 (EP,KR);
A61F13/476 (EP,KR);
A61F13/5515 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/18] | Title | German: | EINZELVERPACKUNGEN FÜR ABSORBIERENDE ARTIKEL | [2000/18] | English: | INDIVIDUAL PACKAGES FOR ABSORBENT ARTICLES | [2000/18] | French: | EMBALLAGES INDIVIDUELS POUR PRODUITS ABSORBANTS | [2000/18] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 13.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/01] | 26.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.03.2000 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   07.04.2000 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9627351 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0764434 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-5 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4765477 (FROEIDH ARNE [SE], et al) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | US2750033 | US3973567 | US4556146 | US5088993 | US4425130 | US4690680 |