Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0998744

EP0998744 - A MODEL AND COMMAND SET FOR AN AV/C-BASED DISC MEDIA PLAYER/RECORDER SUBUNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SONY ELECTRONICS INC. (a Delaware corporation)
Sony Drive Park Ridge
New Jersey 07656 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
SONY ELECTRONICS INC. (a Delaware corporation)
Sony Drive
Park Ridge, New Jersey 07656 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LUDTKE, Harold, Aaron
5876 Ettersberg Drive
San Jose, CA 95123 / US
02 / KAWAMURA, Harumi
2-12-6-101 Okusawa, Setagaya-ku
Tokyo 158 / JP
03 / INOUE, Hiraku
5-11-16-205, Kitaterao
Tsurumi-ku, Yokohamashi, Kanagawa 230 / JP
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Pilch, Adam John Michael
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]Pilch, Adam John Michael
D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date98936968.124.07.1998
[2000/19]
WO1998US15142
Priority number, dateUS19970054258P30.07.1997         Original published format: US 54258 P
[2000/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9906997
Date:11.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0998744
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999
[2000/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0998744
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:G11B19/02, H04B1/20
[2000/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/19]
TitleGerman:MODELL UND KOMMANDOSATZ FÜR AV/C-BASIERTEN PLATTENSPIELER/AUFZEICHNUNGSGERÄTSUBEINHEIT[2000/19]
English:A MODEL AND COMMAND SET FOR AN AV/C-BASED DISC MEDIA PLAYER/RECORDER SUBUNIT[2000/19]
French:ENSEMBLE MODELE ET COMMANDE DESTINE A UNE SOUS-UNITE DE LECTEUR/ENREGISTREUR DE SUPPORTS DISQUES FONCTIONNANT SELON LE PROTOCOLE AV/C[2000/19]
Entry into regional phase04.02.2000National basic fee paid 
04.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/19]
11.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
10.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
04.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2002Fee for grant paid
02.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
IT06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
DK06.02.2003
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
CY24.07.2003
IE24.07.2003
LU24.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
DK06.02.2003
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
CY24.07.2003
IE24.07.2003
LU24.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
Former [2006/24]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
CY24.07.2003
IE24.07.2003
LU24.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
Former [2005/02]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
CY24.07.2003
LU24.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
Former [2004/39]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
CY24.07.2003
LU24.07.2003
Former [2004/36]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
CY24.07.2003
Former [2004/04]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2003/51]AT06.11.2002
BE06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/43]AT06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/39]AT06.11.2002
CH06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/37]AT06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/31]GR06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/29]PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/19]SE06.02.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0612157  (SONY CORP [JP]);
 [A]EP0756276  (SONY CORP [JP]);
 [A]JPH09120666
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 097, no. 009, [A] * abstract *