Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1003912

EP1003912 - SURFACE-BOUND, BIMOLECULAR, DOUBLE-STRANDED DNA ARRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.08.2002
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The President and Fellows of Harvard College
17 Quincy Street
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
THE PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE
17 Quincy Street
Cambridge, MA 02114 / US
Former [2000/34]For all designated states
HARVARD UNIVERSITY
17 Quincy Street
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE
University Place, 124 Mount Auburn
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138-5701 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHURCH, George, M.
218 Kent Street
Brookline, MA 02146 / US
02 / BULYK, Martha, L.
103 Browne Street 3
Brookline, MA 02146 / US
[2000/22]
Representative(s)'t Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]'t Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus , et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Former [2000/22]'t Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus , et al
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date98937094.524.07.1998
[2000/22]
WO1998US15408
Priority number, dateUS1997090654305.08.1997         Original published format: US 906543
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9907888
Date:18.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1003912
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999
[2000/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, C07H21/02
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
TitleGerman:OBERFLÄCHENGEBUNDENE, BIMOLEKULARE, DOPPELSTRÄNGIGE DNA-MATRIZEN[2000/22]
English:SURFACE-BOUND, BIMOLECULAR, DOUBLE-STRANDED DNA ARRAYS[2000/22]
French:MATRICES D'ADN DOUBLE BRIN, BIMOLECULAIRE, LIE EN SURFACE[2000/22]
Entry into regional phase06.03.2000National basic fee paid 
06.03.2000Search fee paid 
06.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
06.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
02.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/41]
19.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5556752  (LOCKHART DAVID J [US], et al);
 [Y]  - SCOTT J. K., ET AL., "SEARCHING FOR PEPTIDE LIGANDS WITH AN EPITOPE LIBRARY.", Science, American Association for the Advancement of Science, US, US, (19900727), vol. 249., doi:10.1126/science.1696028, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 386 - 390., XP002913658

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1696028
 [Y]  - LAM K. S., ET AL., "A NEW TYPE OF SYNTHETIC PEPTIDE LIBRARY FOR IDENTIFYING LIGAND-BINDING ACTIVITY.", NATURE, Nature Publishing Group, United Kingdom, United Kingdom, (19911107), vol. 354., doi:10.1038/354082a0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 82 - 84., XP002913659

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/354082a0
 [Y]  - BRENNECK S., ET AL., "ENCODED COMBINATORIAL CHEMISTRY.", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19920601), vol. 86., doi:10.1073/pnas.89.12.5381, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5381 - 5383., XP002913660

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.12.5381