Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1011652

EP1011652 - NOVEL DIARYLSULFONE NON-NUCLEOSIDE REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE INHIBITORS OF HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.06.2007
Database last updated on 19.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.08.2007  [2007/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University of the Sciences in Philadelphia
600 South Forty-Third Street
Philadelphia, PA 19104-4495 / US
[2000/26]
Inventor(s)01 / ZANGER, Murray
512 Devon Road
Havertown, PA 19083 / US
[2000/26]
Representative(s)WP Thompson
8th Floor
1 Mann Island
Liverpool L3 1BP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]W.P. Thompson & Co.
Coopers Building, Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date98937186.929.07.1998
[2000/26]
WO1998US15577
Priority number, dateUS1997090191929.07.1997         Original published format: US 901919
[2000/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9906037
Date:11.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1011652
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999
[2000/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.02.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.11.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/10, A61K31/18, A61K31/37, C07C307/02, C07C323/22, C07D215/02, C07D215/36
[2000/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/26]
TitleGerman:DIARYLSULFONEN, DIE DIE REVERSE TRASCRIPTASE HEMMEN UND DIE NEUE, NICHT-NUCLEOSIDE INHIBITOREN VOM MENSCHLICHEN HIV VIRUS SIND[2000/26]
English:NOVEL DIARYLSULFONE NON-NUCLEOSIDE REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE INHIBITORS OF HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS[2000/26]
French:DIARYLSULFONES INHIBANT LA TRANSCRIPTASE INVERSE DU VIH ET CONSTITUANT DE NOUVEAUX INHIBITEURS NON NUCLEOSIDES DU VIRUS DE L'IMMUNODEFICIENCE HUMAINE[2000/26]
Entry into regional phase28.02.2000National basic fee paid 
28.02.2000Search fee paid 
28.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
19.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/31]
14.03.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
29.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200508   M06   Fee paid on   12.08.2005
31.07.200609   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0666253  (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1,15-18 *
International search[X]JPS57167465  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO, et al);
 [X]JPS613780  (RICOH KK);
 [X]EP0475707  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]);
 [X]US5444036  (IWASAKI AKIKO [JP], et al);
 [X]WO9206683  (RES CORP TECHNOLOGIES INC [US])
 [X]  - BUCKHEIT R. W., ET AL., "A DIARYLSULPHONE NON-NUCLEOSIDE REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE INHIBITOR WITH A UNIQUE SENSITIVITY PROFILE TO DRUG-RESISTANT VIRUS ISOLATES.", ANTIVIRAL CHEMISTRY & CHEMOTHERAPY., International Medical Press, GB, GB, (19960101), vol. 07., no. 05., ISSN 0956-3202, pages 243 - 252., XP002914939
 [X]  - Chemical Abstracts Service (C A S), Database accession no. 90-120608, XP002914940
 [X]  - Chemical Abstracts Service (C A S), Database accession no. 73-34508, XP002914941
 [X]  - Chemical Abstracts Service (C A S), Database accession no. 66-65235, XP002914942
 [X]  - Chemical Abstracts Service (C A S), Database accession no. 67-21578, XP002914943
 [X]  - ZANGER M., ET AL., "1,2,3,4-TETRAHYDROQUINOLINE 8-SULFONES.", The Journal of Organic Chemistry, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19710101), vol. 36., no. 09., doi:10.1021/jo00808a042, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 1321 - 1324., XP002914938

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00808a042
 [X]  - MCMAHON J. B., ET AL., "DIARYLSULFONES, A NEW CHEMICAL CLASS OF NONNUCLEOSIDE ANTIVIRAL INHIBITORS OF HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS TYPE 1 REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE.", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, American Society for Microbiology, US, US, (19930401), vol. 37., no. 04., ISSN 0066-4804, pages 754 - 760., XP002914937