Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1005452

EP1005452 - ANIONIC ALKOXYLATE SURFACTANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Orica Australia Pty Ltd
1 Nicholson Street Melbourne
Victoria 3000 / AU
[N/P]
Former [2000/23]For all designated states
Orica Australia Pty Ltd
1 Nicholson Street
Melbourne, Victoria 3000 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / SALTER, Elizabeth, Ann
12 Stawell Street
Richmond, VIC 3121 / AU
02 / HOULIHAN, Patrick, William
5 Karjen Place
Wheelers Hill, VIC 3150 / AU
03 / BAJRASZEWSKI, Michael, Anthony
3/47-49 Parkside Avenue
Keilor East, VIC 3033 / AU
04 / PARR, Rodney, Walter
13 Wilma Court
Doncaster, VIC 3108 / AU
05 / MOODY, Keith
1 Thaxted Court
Watsonia North, VIC 3087 / AU
[2000/23]
Representative(s)Marshall, Monica Anne , et al
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/23]Marshall, Monica Anne , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98937355.006.08.1998
[2000/23]
WO1998AU00620
Priority number, dateAU1997PO0846208.08.1997         Original published format: AU PO846297
[2000/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9907673
Date:18.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1005452
Date:07.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999
[2000/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1005452
Date:17.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU18.02.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07C305/04, C07C305/06, C07C305/10, C07F9/09, C08G65/48, C08G65/32, C11D1/29, C11D1/34, B01F17/00, C09D133/06, C08G65/26
[2001/22]
Former International [2000/23]C07C305/04, C07C305/06, C07C305/10, C07F9/09, C08G65/48, C08G65/32, C11D1/29, C11D1/34
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/23]
Extension statesAL02.03.2000
LT02.03.2000
LV02.03.2000
MK02.03.2000
RO02.03.2000
SI02.03.2000
TitleGerman:ANIONISCHES ALKOXYLATTENSID[2000/23]
English:ANIONIC ALKOXYLATE SURFACTANT[2000/23]
French:TENSIOACTIF ANIONIQUE ALCOXYLE[2000/23]
Entry into regional phase02.03.2000National basic fee paid 
02.03.2000Search fee paid 
02.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
02.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/23]
02.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
05.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2004Fee for grant paid
07.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10]
Request for further processing for:05.02.2003Request for further processing filed
05.02.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.03.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
CY17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
IT17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
ES28.06.2004
IE06.08.2004
LU06.08.2004
PT17.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
CY17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
ES28.06.2004
IE06.08.2004
LU06.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/46]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
ES28.06.2004
IE06.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/23]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
ES28.06.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/18]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
ES28.06.2004
Former [2005/02]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
ES28.06.2004
Former [2005/01]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/44]AT17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/43]AT17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI17.03.2004
SE17.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4443643  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 43 - page 3, line 61; claims 1-4 *;
 [X]DE4125989  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-10 * page 2, line 36 - page 4, line 2; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]US5478876  (COOK IAIN [AU]) [A] 11-18 * column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 62; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]US5362832  (COOK IAIN [AU]) [A] 11-18 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 47; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]US5346973  (FEUSTEL DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 11-18 * column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 4; examples 5-8 *
International search[X]DE4443643  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]);
 [X]WO9303007  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]);
 [A]JPH09188661  ;
 [A]US5653988  (GERBER BOZENA [DE], et al);
 [A]WO9113849  (ICI AUSTRALIA OPERATIONS [AU]);
 [A]US4721581  (RAMACHANDRAN PALLASSANA N [US], et al);
 [A]US4830764  (WIEDEMANN ACHIM [DE])
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 39, Database accession no. 1997-420564, XP002945117 & JPH09188661 A 19970722 (KAO CORP)