blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0993465


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.12.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.01.2004  [2004/04]
26.09.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  12.11.2003  [2003/46]
08.08.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.09.2003  [2003/39]
04.10.2002 (Expected) grant published on  20.11.2002  [2002/47]
23.08.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
07.06.2002 Communication of intention to grant
07.06.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
31.05.2002 Renewal fee
12.04.2002 Communication of intention to grant
12.04.2002 First examination report
12.05.2001 Renewal fee
19.05.2000 Renewal fee
03.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
03.03.2000 Request for examination filed published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
30.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
23.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
11.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
18.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
02.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication