Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0993465
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3930058BGlobal Dossier 13.06.2007B2
JP2002506452 26.02.2002A
Priority number Date
CH153697 25.06.1997
EP9803573 13.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0993465Global Dossier 20.11.2002B1
EP0993465 19.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
CH153697 25.06.1997
EP9803573 13.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU8626698 19.01.1999A
Priority number Date
CH153697 25.06.1997
EP9803573 13.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9810341 06.09.2011B1
BR9810341 05.09.2000A
Priority number Date
CH153697 25.06.1997
EP9803573 13.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2290953 25.03.2008C
CA2290953 07.01.1999A1
Priority number Date
CH153697 25.06.1997
EP9803573 13.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69809552T 17.07.2003T2
DE69809552D 02.01.2003D1
Priority number Date
CH153697 25.06.1997
EP9803573 13.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR100569619B 11.04.2006B1
KR20010014233 26.02.2001A
Priority number Date
CH153697 25.06.1997
EP9803573 13.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6407190 18.06.2002B1
Priority number Date
CH153697 25.06.1997
EP9803573 13.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9900396Global Dossier 07.01.1999A1
Priority number Date
CH153697 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MX221283 07.07.2004B
MX9911933 31.03.2000A
Priority number Date
CH153697 25.06.1997