Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993465

EP0993465 - RUTHENIUM AND OSMIUM CARBENE CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 21.01.2004  [2004/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc.
Klybeckstrasse 141
4057 Basel / CH
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN DER SCHAAF, Paul, Adriaan
Marsstrasse 17
4123 Alischwil / CH
02 / HAFNER, Andreas
Blakenweg 23
4460 Gelterkinden / CH
03 / MÜHLEBACH, Andreas
Les Grands Esserts 7
CH-1782 Belfaux / CH
[2000/16]
Application number, filing date98937482.213.06.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998EP03573
Priority number, dateCH1997000153625.06.1997         Original published format: CH 153697
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900396
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993465
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993465
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07F15/00, C08F32/00
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:RUTHENIUM UND OSMIUMCARBENKATALYSATOREN[2000/16]
English:RUTHENIUM AND OSMIUM CARBENE CATALYSTS[2000/16]
French:CATALYSEURS DE TYPE CARBENE DE RUTHENIUM ET D'OSMIUM[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase12.11.1999National basic fee paid 
12.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
19.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.08.2002Fee for grant paid
08.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
16.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
ES29.05.2003
[2004/04]
Former [2003/39]CH20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9604289  (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US]) [DA] 1-17 * the whole document *
 [X]  - WU, ZHE ET AL, "Reactions of Ruthenium Carbenes of the Type (PPh3)2(X)2Ru:CH-CH:CPh2 (X = Cl and CF3COO) with Strained Acyclic Olefins and Functionalized Olefins", J. AM. CHEM. SOC. (1995), 117(20), 5503-11 CODEN: JACSAT;ISSN: 0002-7863, (1995), XP002083118 [X] 1-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00125a010
 [X]  - HARTSHORN, ANGUS J. ET AL, "Carbene complexes. Part 13. The synthesis and characterization of secondary carbene complexes of vanadium(I), chromium(0), molybdenum(0), tungsten(0), manganese(I), rhenium(I), iron(0), ruthenium(II), cobalt(I), iridium(III), and platinum(IV), and hydridorhodium(III)", J. CHEM. SOC., DALTON TRANS. (1978), (4), 348-56 CODEN: JCDTBI;ISSN: 0300-9246, (1978), XP002083119 [X] 1-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/dt9780000348
 [X]  - CHRISTIAN, D. F. ET AL, "Preparation and structure of the secondary carbene complex diiodocarbonyl(triphenyl phosphine)(isocyanomethylbenzene)(forimidoy ltolyl)ruthenium", J. ORGANOMET. CHEM. (1974), 81(1), C7-C8 CODEN: JORCAI, (1974), XP002083120 [X] 1-7 * the whole document *
 [X]  - CHRISTIAN, D. F. ET AL, "Neutral, cationic, and dicationic ruthenium(II) complexes of the secondary carbenes p-tolylformimidoyl and methyl p-tolylformimidoyl", J. ORGANOMET. CHEM. (1974), 80(2), C35-C38 CODEN: JORCAI, (1974), XP002083121 [X] 1-7 * the whole document *