Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993495

EP0993495 - PIGMENT PREPARATIONS WITH RADIATION CURABLE BINDER SUITABLE FOR INK JET PRINTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2003/15]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HERRMANN, Manfred
Parkstrasse 23
D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
02 / MOTZKUS, Gert
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 80
D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
03 / REICH, Wolfgang
Rietburgstrasse 10a
D-67133 Maxdorf / DE
04 / SENS, Rüdiger
Faselwiese 15
D-67069 Ludwigshafen / DE
05 / SIEGEL, Bernd
Frankenstrasse 18
D-67166 Otterstadt / DE
06 / SIEMENSMEYER, Karl
Erich-Heckel-Strasse 1
D-67227 Frankenthal / DE
[2000/16]
Application number, filing date98937502.718.06.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998EP03706
Priority number, dateDE199712776730.06.1997         Original published format: DE 19727767
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9901517
Date:14.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993495
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993495
Date:09.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C09D17/00, C09D11/00, B41M7/00
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/16]
TitleGerman:ALS INK-JET-TINTEN GEEIGNETE PIGMENTZUBEREITUNGEN MIT STRAHLUNGSHÄRTBAREM BINDEMITTEL[2000/16]
English:PIGMENT PREPARATIONS WITH RADIATION CURABLE BINDER SUITABLE FOR INK JET PRINTING METHOD[2000/16]
French:PREPARATIONS DE PIGMENT CONVENANT AU PROCEDE D'IMPRESSION PAR JET D'ENCRE ET CONTENANT UN LIANT DURCISSABLE PAR RAYONNEMENT[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase04.12.1999National basic fee paid 
04.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
12.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2003Fee for grant paid
23.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.01.2004  23.01.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Sun Chemical Corporation Patent & Legal Deparment
222 Bridge Plaza South
Fort Lee, NJ 07024 / US
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/35]
Opponent(s)01  09.01.2004  23.01.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Sun Chemical Corporation Patent & Legal Deparment
222 Bridge Plaza South
Fort Lee, NJ 07024 / US
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2004/10]
Opponent(s)01  09.01.2004   
Sun Chemical Corporation Patent & Legal Deparment
222 Bridge Plaza South
Fort Lee, NJ 07024 / US
Opponent's representative
VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
13.02.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.06.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.03.2006Date of oral proceedings
31.03.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
31.03.2006Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
09.01.2007Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/18]
18.01.2007Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/08]
Appeal following opposition12.06.2006Appeal received No.  T0913/06
09.01.2007Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent inadmissible
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
15.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[YD]EP0658607  (CANON KK [JP]) [YD] 1-8 * page 4, lines 19-21; claims 1-12 *;
 [Y]US5538549  (KATO MASAHITO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * column 3, line 48 * * column 4, paragraph 1; table 1 *;
 [A]GB1551829  (ICI LTD) [A] 1,5,8 * page 1, lines 40-42 * * page 2, lines 80-86 * * page 2, lines 113-121; examples 1-4 *;
 [AD]JPH0848922  ;
 [A]DE4413242  (BASF LACKE & FARBEN [DE]) [A] 6-9 * abstract *
 [AD]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 17, Database accession no. 96-167368, XP002082415 & JPH0848922 A 19960220 (TEIKOKU INK SEIZO KK) [AD] 1,8 * abstract *