blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1003687 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1003687



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 148
26.03.1998 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
11.02.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 29
11.02.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
16.03.1999 Priority document Search / examination 26
26.03.1999 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
31.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
02.07.1999 Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase Search / examination 1
27.09.1999 Demand for preliminary examination received in time (21-months time limit no longer applicable) Search / examination 1
08.12.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
11.01.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
13.01.2000 General authorisation Search / examination 1
13.01.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
19.04.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.09.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.09.2000 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
27.12.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
27.12.2000 Description Search / examination 2
27.12.2000 Claims Search / examination 3
16.03.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.03.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
10.07.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.07.2001 Description Search / examination 2
10.07.2001 Claims Search / examination 1
07.08.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.08.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.09.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
25.09.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.09.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
03.01.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
23.01.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
06.02.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
06.02.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
06.02.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.09.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.09.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
22.02.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1