blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1003687


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.03.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.05.2007  [2007/18]
17.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
21.11.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.01.2004  [2004/02]
12.09.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  29.10.2003  [2003/44]
06.06.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.07.2003  [2003/30]
21.09.2002 (Expected) grant published on  06.11.2002  [2002/45]
30.08.2002 Renewal fee
01.03.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.01.2002 Communication of intention to grant
21.01.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.09.2001 Communication of intention to grant
07.09.2001 Change - German title published on  24.10.2001 [2001/43]
24.08.2001 Change - German title published on  10.10.2001 [2001/41]
23.08.2001 Renewal fee
20.08.2001 Examination report or reply
13.03.2001 Examination report or reply
16.02.2001 Examination report or reply
15.09.2000 First examination report
13.09.2000 Examination report or reply
25.08.2000 Renewal fee
14.04.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  31.05.2000 [2000/22]
14.04.2000 Request for examination filed published on  31.05.2000 [2000/22]
04.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
25.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
24.09.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
04.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
25.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
26.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
27.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
02.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication