blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1003687
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1003687Global Dossier 06.11.2002B1
EP1003687 31.05.2000A1
Priority number Date
GB9802331 04.08.1998
GB9716910 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU8637498 01.03.1999A
Priority number Date
GB9802331 04.08.1998
GB9716910 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69809253D 12.12.2002D1
Priority number Date
GB9802331 04.08.1998
GB9716910 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6308869 30.10.2001B1
Priority number Date
GB9802331 04.08.1998
GB9716910 11.08.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9907632Global Dossier 18.02.1999A1
Priority number Date
GB9716910 11.08.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1132778C 31.12.2003C
CN1265633 06.09.2000A
Priority number Date
GB9716910 11.08.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB2328204 17.02.1999A
GB9716910D 15.10.1997D0
Priority number Date
GB9716910 11.08.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2198132 10.02.2003C2
Priority number Date
GB9716910 11.08.1997