blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1003687

Designated contracting states DELapse: 07.02.2003
 DKLapse: 06.02.2003
 FRLapse: 06.11.2002
 GB 
 NLLapse: 06.11.2002
Examination procedure06.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase11.01.2000National basic fee paid 
11.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted06.11.2002
Opposition procedure07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit published on 29.10.2003 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:31.05.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE DK FR GB NL
 
Event date:31.05.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000111
 
Event date:02.11.2000 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20000915
 
Event date:10.10.2001 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:KEG FITTING FOR DISPENSING LIQUIDS UNDER PRESSURE
 
Event date:24.10.2001 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:KEG FITTING FOR DISPENSING LIQUIDS UNDER PRESSURE
 
Event date:06.11.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20021106
 
Event date:06.11.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20021106
 
Event date:06.11.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE DK FR GB NL
 
Event date:06.11.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:12.12.2002 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69809253
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20021212
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:06.02.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20030206
 
Event date:07.02.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20030207
 
Event date:01.04.2003 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT
 
Event date:29.08.2003 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED
 
Event date:29.10.2003 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20030807
 
Event date:31.10.2012 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20120801
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:23.04.2014 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20130804
 
Event date:31.07.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130804