Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1003687

EP1003687 - Keg fitting for dispensing liquids under pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/22]KEG AND KEG FITTING FOR DISPENSING LIQUIDS UNDER PRESSURE
[2001/41]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Spears Limited
15 Belmont Shrewsbury
Shropshire SY1 1TE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
Spears Limited
15 Belmont
Shrewsbury, Shropshire SY1 1TE / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Simpson, Kenneth Leonard
The Cedars, 173 Ellesmere Road
Shrewsbury, Shropshire SY1 2RE / GB
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Wardley, Diana Mary
Forresters
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Wardley, Diana Mary
Forrester & Boehmert, Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date98937649.604.08.1998
[2000/22]
WO1998GB02331
Priority number, dateGB1997001691011.08.1997         Original published format: GB 9716910
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9907632
Date:18.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1003687
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1003687
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:B67D1/08
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/22]
TitleGerman:Fassarmatur zum Abgeben von unter Druck stehenden Flüssigkeiten[2001/41]
English:Keg fitting for dispensing liquids under pressure[2001/41]
French:Connecteur pour fût permettant la distribution de liquides sous pression[2001/41]
Former [2000/22]FASS UND FASSARMATUR ZUM ABGEBEN VON UNTER DRUCK STEHENDEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN
Former [2000/22]KEG AND KEG FITTING FOR DISPENSING LIQUIDS UNDER PRESSURE
Former [2000/22]FUT ET DISPOSITIF POUR FUT PERMETTANT LA DISTRIBUTION DE LIQUIDES SOUS PRESSION
Entry into regional phase11.01.2000National basic fee paid 
11.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
15.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.02.2002Fee for grant paid
06.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
DK06.02.2003
DE07.02.2003
[2007/18]
Former [2006/14]FR06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
DE07.02.2003
Former [2004/02]NL06.11.2002
DE07.02.2003
Former [2003/30]NL06.11.2002
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0025682  (GRUNDY TEDDINGTON LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 5 - line 21; figure 1 * [Y] 3,6;
 [Y]FR2267252  (GKN SANKEY LTD [GB]) [Y] 3,6 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, line 1; figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP0512152  (BREITWISCH JOSEF & CO [DE]) [Y] 6 * figures 4-7 *;
 [A]NL7704708  (BERNARD FRANS FRITS JOHANNA MA) [A] 9,10 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *