Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1009355

EP1009355 - DEVICE FOR PRESSURIZING LIMBS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.09.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medical Compression Systems (D.B.N.)
Harugei Malhut Street 9
Tel Aviv 69714 / IL
[2000/25]
Inventor(s)01 / BARAK, Jakob
Haoren Street 20
44813 Oranit / IL
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Desaix, Anne , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S.
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]Desaix, Anne , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98937751.013.08.1998
[2000/25]
WO1998IL00378
Priority number, dateIL1997012166131.08.1997         Original published format: IL 12166197
US1998003815711.03.1998         Original published format: US 38157
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9911215
Date:11.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1009355
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999
[2000/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1009355
Date:19.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61H23/04
[2000/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/25]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR KOMPRESSIONSBEHANDLUNG VON GLIEDMASSEN[2000/25]
English:DEVICE FOR PRESSURIZING LIMBS[2000/25]
French:DISPOSITIF DE MISE SOUS PRESSION DES MEMBRES[2000/25]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2000National basic fee paid 
31.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.03.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/25]
04.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
05.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.05.2003Fee for grant paid
27.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200003   M06   Fee paid on   18.10.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.11.2003
BE19.11.2003
CH19.11.2003
CY19.11.2003
FI19.11.2003
LI19.11.2003
NL19.11.2003
DK19.02.2004
GR19.02.2004
SE19.02.2004
PT19.04.2004
IE13.08.2004
LU13.08.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]AT19.11.2003
BE19.11.2003
CH19.11.2003
CY19.11.2003
FI19.11.2003
LI19.11.2003
NL19.11.2003
DK19.02.2004
GR19.02.2004
SE19.02.2004
IE13.08.2004
LU13.08.2004
Former [2005/46]AT19.11.2003
BE19.11.2003
CH19.11.2003
FI19.11.2003
LI19.11.2003
NL19.11.2003
DK19.02.2004
GR19.02.2004
SE19.02.2004
IE13.08.2004
Former [2004/52]AT19.11.2003
BE19.11.2003
CH19.11.2003
FI19.11.2003
LI19.11.2003
NL19.11.2003
DK19.02.2004
GR19.02.2004
SE19.02.2004
Former [2004/41]AT19.11.2003
CH19.11.2003
FI19.11.2003
LI19.11.2003
NL19.11.2003
DK19.02.2004
GR19.02.2004
SE19.02.2004
Former [2004/33]AT19.11.2003
CH19.11.2003
FI19.11.2003
LI19.11.2003
NL19.11.2003
GR19.02.2004
SE19.02.2004
Former [2004/31]AT19.11.2003
FI19.11.2003
SE19.02.2004
Former [2004/26]FI19.11.2003
SE19.02.2004
Former [2004/24]SE19.02.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]DE1903217  (CONTI FRANCESCO) [X] 1-3,5,11-13 * figure -; claims 3,9,11 *;
 [XY]EP0388200  (KENDALL & CO [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,12 * column 9, line 1 - line 6; figures 1-5 * * column 13, line 24 - line 37 * [Y] 7,14;
 [Y]US5288286  (DAVIS ALBERT D [US]) [Y] 7 * column A; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]DE2710677  (SWOBODA WALTER) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 22 - line 50; figure - *;
 [X]US2880721  (CORCORAN LAURENCE E) [X] 1,10 * figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]US4573453  (TISSOT JEAN [FR]) [Y] 14 * column 2, line 62 - line 68; figure - *;
 [X]GB2017508  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) [X] 1 * page 2, line 38 - line 44; figure 1 *;
 [X]FR2122734  (BRACHET JACQUES) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 15; figure - *
by applicantUS5117812
 US5007411
 US5025781
 US5591200