Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0998599

EP0998599 - SUPERABSORBING FIBERS AND FILMS AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2004
Database last updated on 19.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solutia Inc.
10300 Olive Boulevard, P.O. Box 66760 St. Louis
MO 63167-6760 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
Solutia Inc.
10300 Olive Boulevard, P.O. Box 66760
St. Louis, MO 63167-6760 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHOU, Yueting
315 Branchport Drive
Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US
02 / FEAST, Timothy, Paul
2020 Woodmoor Ridge Drive
Wildwood, MO 63011 / US
03 / ZHANG, Jingen
12034 Foxpoint Drive
Maryland Heights, MO 63043 / US
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Albrecht, Thomas , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]Albrecht, Thomas, Dr. , et al
Kraus, Weisert & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date98938021.724.07.1998
[2000/19]
WO1998US15504
Priority number, dateUS19970053635P24.07.1997         Original published format: US 53635 P
US19970062306P17.10.1997         Original published format: US 62306 P
[2000/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9905346
Date:04.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0998599
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999
[2000/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0998599
Date:12.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:D01F6/80, C08J5/18, C08G69/10, C08G73/10, // (C08L77/04, 79:08)
[2000/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/19]
TitleGerman:SUPERABSORBIERENDE FASERN UND FOLIEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[2000/19]
English:SUPERABSORBING FIBERS AND FILMS AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING SAME[2000/19]
French:FIBRES ET FILMS SUPERABSORBANTS ET LEUR PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2000/19]
Entry into regional phase05.01.2000National basic fee paid 
05.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/19]
17.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2002Fee for grant paid
02.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200205   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
DK12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
CY24.07.2003
IE24.07.2003
LU24.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
ES30.09.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/40]CH12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
DK12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
CY24.07.2003
IE24.07.2003
LU24.07.2003
ES30.09.2003
Former [2004/39]CH12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
DK12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
CY24.07.2003
LU24.07.2003
ES30.09.2003
Former [2004/36]CH12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
DK12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
CY24.07.2003
ES30.09.2003
Former [2004/23]CH12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
DK12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
ES30.09.2003
Former [2004/04]CH12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
PT16.06.2003
ES30.09.2003
Former [2003/46]CH12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2003/43]CH12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2003/40]CH12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
Cited inInternational search[DA]US5525703  (KALOTA DENNIS J [US]) [DA] 1-40 * column W *;
 [A]US5478919  (KOSKAN LARRY P [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * column W *;
 [A]EP0658586  (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1-40 * column W *;
 [D]US5525703  (KALOTA DENNIS J [US]);
 [A]US3846380  (FUJIMOTO Y, et al) [A] 1-40 * column W *