Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1000177

EP1000177 - SYNTHETIC ANTIGENS FOR THE DETECTION OF ANTIBODIES HAVING IMMUNOREACTIVITY AGAINST HIV VIRUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/20]SYNTHETIC ANTIGEN FOR THE DETECTION OF ANTIBODIES IMMUNOREACTIVE WITH HIV VIRUS
[2006/39]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.02.2008
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, LU
published on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc.
Corporate Offices 1000 Alfred Nobel Drive
Hercules, CA 94547 / US
[2007/43]
Former [2007/17]For all designated states
GENETIC SYSTEMS CORPORATION
6565 185th Avenue N.E. Redmond
Washington 98052 / US
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
GENETIC SYSTEMS CORPORATION
6565 185th Avenue N.E.
Redmond, Washington 98052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COLEMAN, Patrick, F.
17211-77th Avenue West
Edmonds, WA 98026 / US
02 / CHONG-DUG SU, Peter
6001-84th Avenue S.E.
Mercer Island, WA 98040 / US
03 / MONJI, Nobuo
3545 N.E. 98th Street
Seattle, WA 98115 / US
04 / COLE, Carol-Ann
1116-18th Avenue East
Seattle, WA 98112 / US
05 / GOSHORN, Alice, Kamp
20309-17th Avenue N.W.
Seattle, WA 98177 / US
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/20]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date98938310.431.07.1998
[2000/20]
WO1998US16160
Priority number, dateUS1997090482601.08.1997         Original published format: US 904826
[2000/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9906599
Date:11.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1000177
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999
[2000/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1000177
Date:25.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.02.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/70, C07K7/00, C07K14/00, C07K14/16, G01N33/569
[2003/04]
Former International [2000/20]C12Q1/70, C07K7/00, C07K14/00, C07K14/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/20]
TitleGerman:SYNTHETISCHE ANTIGENE ZUM NACHWEIS VON ANTIKÖRPERN MIT IMMUNREAKTIVITÄT GEGEN HIV-VIRUS[2006/39]
English:SYNTHETIC ANTIGENS FOR THE DETECTION OF ANTIBODIES HAVING IMMUNOREACTIVITY AGAINST HIV VIRUS[2006/39]
French:ANTIGENES SYNTHETIQUES POUR LA DETECTION DES ANTICORPS IMMUNOREACTIFS AU VIRUS VIH[2006/39]
Former [2000/20]SYNTHETISCHES ANTIGEN ZUM NACHWEIS VON ANTIKÖRPERN IMMUNREAKTIV MIT DEM HIV VIRUS
Former [2000/20]SYNTHETIC ANTIGEN FOR THE DETECTION OF ANTIBODIES IMMUNOREACTIVE WITH HIV VIRUS
Former [2000/20]ANTIGENE SYNTHETIQUE UTILISE POUR LA DETECTION DES ANTICORPS IMMUNOREACTIFS AU VIRUS VIH
Entry into regional phase14.02.2000National basic fee paid 
14.02.2000Search fee paid 
14.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
14.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
17.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2007Fee for grant paid
13.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07007809.2  / EP1878805
Opposition(s)28.01.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
CY25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
NL25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
GR26.07.2007
IE31.07.2007
LU31.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
PT25.09.2007
[2010/05]
Former [2008/45]AT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
NL25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
GR26.07.2007
IE31.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
PT25.09.2007
Former [2008/22]AT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
NL25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
GR26.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
PT25.09.2007
Former [2008/21]AT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
NL25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
GR26.07.2007
PT25.09.2007
Former [2008/16]AT25.04.2007
BE25.04.2007
CH25.04.2007
DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
LI25.04.2007
NL25.04.2007
SE25.07.2007
PT25.09.2007
Documents cited:Search[DX]US5075211  (COSAND WESLEY L [US], et al) [DX] 1-12,14-16,26-34 * abstract * * column 2, line 18 - line 27 * * column 2, line 54 - column 10, line 44 * * claims 1-23, in particular claims 10 and 15 *;
 [X]US5580739  (ALIZON MARC [FR], et al) [X] 1-11,13,19,30 * abstract * * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 39 * * claims 2,9,10,13 *;
 [Y]RU2043411  (BIOTEKHNOLOGICHESKAYA KOMPANIY [RU]) [Y] 1-16,19,26-34 * abstract *;
 [X]  POLLET D E ET AL, "CONFIRMATION AND DIFFERENTIATION OF ANTIBODIES TO HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS 1 AND 2 WITH A STRIP-BASED ASSAY INCLUDING RECOMBINANT ANTIGENS AND SYNTHETIC PEPTIDES", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 37, no. 10 PART 1, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 1700 - 1707, XP001105753 [X] 1-12,14-16,26-34 * abstract * * page 978 *
 [XY]  WAIN-HOBSON S ET AL, "NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCE OF THE AIDS VIRUS, LAV", CELL, MIT PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, MA,, US, (1985), vol. 40, no. 1, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 9 - 17, XP000608742 [X] 33,34 * abstract * * figure 1 * [Y] 1-12,14-16,26-32

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(85)90303-4
 [Y]  STERNBERG M J ET AL, "Prediction of antigenic determinants and secondary structures of the major AIDS virus proteins.", FEBS LETTERS. NETHERLANDS 29 JUN 1987, (19870629), vol. 218, no. 2, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 231 - 237, XP001105722 [Y] 1-16,19,26-34 * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(87)81052-9
 [Y]  SPRENGERS E D ET AL, "A MICRO-ELISA SYSTEM FOR THE DETECTION OF BOTH ANTI-HIV-1 AND ANTI-HIV-2 ANTIBODIES", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (1991), vol. 139, no. 1, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 77 - 82, XP001105718 [Y] 1-16,19,26-34 * page 77 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(91)90353-H
 [Y]  IVANOV V S ET AL, "STUDY OF THE ANTIGENIC STRUCTURE OF HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUSES BY MEANS OF SYNTHETIC PEPTIDES", DATABASE BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, Database accession no. PREV199294121790, XP002213768 [Y] 1-16,19,26-34 * abstract *
    [] BIOORGANICHESKAYA KHIMIYA, (1992), vol. 18, no. 6, ISSN 0132-3423, pages 784 - 793,
 [Y]  MONJI N ET AL, "Sensitive and specific HIV-1/HIV-2 EIA using env and pol synthetic peptides.", DATABASE BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, Database accession no. PREV199698616393, XP001105703 [Y] 1-16,19,26-34 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1537-2995.1995.35295125732.x
    [] TRANSFUSION (BETHESDA), 48th Annual Meeting of the American Association of Blood Banks;New Orleans, Louisiana, USA; November 11-15, 1995, (1995), vol. 35, no. 10 SUPPL., ISSN 0041-1132, page 28S,
 [Y]  MONJI NOBUO ET AL, "Specific and sensitive HIV-1/HIV-2 EIA using env and pol synthetic peptides.", DATABASE BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, Database accession no. PREV199598347548, XP001105443 [Y] 1-16,19,26-34 * abstract *
    [] CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, 47th Annual Meeting of the American Association for Clinical Chemistry, Inc.;Anaheim, California, USA; July 16-20, 1995, (1995), vol. 41, no. S6 PART 2, ISSN 0009-9147, page S50,
 [DY]  CLAVEL F ET AL, "Molecular cloning and polymorphism of the human immune deficiency virus type 2.", NATURE. ENGLAND 1986 DEC 18-31, (19861218), vol. 324, no. 6098, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 691 - 695, XP000605290 [DY] 1-11,13,19,30 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/324691a0
 [A]  DATABASE SWISS-PROT, Database accession no. P04586, XP002239588 [A] 1-12,14-16,26-34 * abstract *
 [A]  DATABASE SWISS-PROT, Database accession no. P04585, XP002239589 [A] 1-12,14-16,26-34 * abstract *
 [A]  DATABASE SWISS-PROT, Database accession no. P04584, XP002239590 [A] 1-11,13,19,30 * abstract *
 [A]  DATABASE EMBASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, Database accession no. K02013.1, XP002239591 [A] 1-12,14-16,26-34 * abstract *
 [A]  FERNS R B ET AL, "MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES DEFINE LINEAR AND CONFORMATIONAL EPITOPES OF HIV-1 POL GENE PRODUCTS", AIDS RESEARCH AND HUMAN RETROVIRUSES, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199103), vol. 7, no. 3, ISSN 0889-2229, pages 307 - 313, XP001011430 [A] 1-16,19,26-34 * abstract *
 [A]  MYERS R A ET AL, "IDENTIFYING HIV-2-SEROPOSITIVE INDIVIDUALS BY REEVALUATING HIV-1 INDETERMINATE SERA", JOURNAL OF ACQUIRED IMMUNE DEFICIENCY SYNDROMES, RAVEN PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199204), vol. 5, no. 4, ISSN 0894-9255, pages 417 - 423, XP001105714 [A] 1-16,19,26-34 * the whole document *
 [A]  MODROW S ET AL, "CARRIER BOUND SYNTHETIC OLIGOPEPTIDES IN ELISA TEST SYSTEMS FOR DISTINCTION BETWEEN HIV-1 AND HIV-2 INFECTION", JOURNAL OF ACQUIRED IMMUNE DEFICIENCY SYNDROMES, RAVEN PRESS, NEW YORK, US, (19890401), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 141 - 148, XP000578021 [A] 1-16,19,26-34 * the whole document *
 [PY]  HICKMAN R K ET AL, "DETECTION AND DIFFERENTIATION OF HIV-1 GROUP O SERA FROM HIV-1 GROUP M AND HIV-2 USING RECOMBINANT ANTIGENS AND PEPTIDES", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGICAL METHODS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (199805), vol. 72, no. 1, ISSN 0166-0934, pages 43 - 49, XP000866196 [PY] 1-16,19,26-34 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0166-0934(98)00017-2
International search[X]EP0267802  (GENETIC SYSTEMS CORP [US]);
 [Y]US4629783  (COSAND WESLEY L [US]);
 [Y]US5206136  (MONJI NOBUO [US], et al);
 [Y]US5439792  (BLAKE JAMES [US], et al)
 [Y]  - RATNER L., ET AL., "COMPLETE NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCE OF THE AIDS VIRUS, HTLV-III.", NATURE, Nature Publishing Group, United Kingdom, United Kingdom, (19850124), vol. 313., doi:10.1038/313277a0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 277 - 284., XP002916367

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/313277a0
 [Y]  - GUYADER M., ET AL., "GENOME ORGANIZATION AND TRANSACTIVATION OF THE HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS TYPE 2.", NATURE, Nature Publishing Group, United Kingdom, United Kingdom, (19870416), vol. 326., doi:10.1038/326662a0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 662 - 669., XP002916368

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/326662a0