Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993361

EP0993361 - HIGH-PRODUCTIVITY SINGLE-STAGE METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING CONTAINERS MADE OF THERMOPLASTIC MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.03.2003  [2003/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIPA S.p.A.
via Caduti del Lavoro, 3
I-31029 Vittorio Veneto / IT
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DE NARDI, Ireneo
Via della Vigna, 2/A
I-31016 Cordignano / IT
02 / ARMELLIN, Alberto
Via Cosmo, 38
I-31029 Vittorio Veneto / IT
03 / RODIGHIERO, Luigi
Via S. Maria in Colle, 13/7
I-31044 Montebelluna / IT
04 / DA RIOL, Nicola
Via Colombera, 25/2
I-33080 Porcia / IT
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Giugni, Valter , et al
Propria S.r.l. Via della Colonna 35
33170 Pordenone / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Giugni, Valter , et al
PROPRIA S.r.l., Via Mazzini 13
33170 Pordenone / IT
Application number, filing date98938620.622.06.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998EP03793
Priority number, dateIT1997PN0003903.07.1997         Original published format: IT PN970039
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9901267
Date:14.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0993361
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993361
Date:27.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:B29C49/64
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:EINSTUFIGES VERFAHREN MIT HOHER PRODUKTIVITÄT UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON BEHÄLTERN AUS KUNSTSTOFF[2000/16]
English:HIGH-PRODUCTIVITY SINGLE-STAGE METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING CONTAINERS MADE OF THERMOPLASTIC MATERIAL[2000/16]
French:PROCEDE EN UNE SEULE ETAPE ET A RENDEMENT ELEVE, ET APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION DE CONTENANTS EN MATIERE THERMOPLASTIQUE[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase21.05.1999National basic fee paid 
21.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.05.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
20.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.2001Fee for grant paid
28.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE27.06.2002
[2002/37]
Cited inInternational search[AP]WO9739874  (SIPA SPA [IT], et al) [AP] 1 * abstract *;
 [AP]EP0813949  (HUSKY INJECTION MOLDING [CA]) [AP] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4261949  (SPURR ROBERT, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0502391  (SIPA SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9608356  (NISSEI ASB MACHINE CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0566995  (NISSEI ASB MACHINE CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [AP]WO9809793  (NISSEI ASB MACHINE CO LTD [JP], et al) [AP] 1;
 []EP0872329  (NISSEI ASB MACHINE CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * abstract *;
 [A]US5589114  (EVANS ROWLAND F [GB]) [A] * abstract *