Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991342

EP0991342 - SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.08.2002
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.09.2002  [2002/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / FÄRBER, Ludwig
Brucknerstrasse 15
D-81677 München / DE
02 / BEERBAUM, Peter
Mühlbachstrasse 24
D-85391 Allershausen / DE
03 / DIETZ, Ralf
Sudetendeutsche Strasse 17
D-80937 München / DE
04 / HERRMANN, Wolfgang
Adlzreiterstrasse 21
D-80337 München / DE
05 / LEIN, Rudolf
Werner-Egk-Bogen 69
D-80939 München / DE
06 / LEITNER, Josef
Freiherr-v.-Mayr-Strasse 7
D-85084 Reichertshofen / DE
07 / MOSER, Erhard
Mattighoferstrasse 5
D-80939 München / DE
08 / SCHREINER, Jürgen
Turnerstrasse 30
D-81827 München / DE
[2000/15]
Application number, filing date98938624.822.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998EP03810
Priority number, dateDE199712640921.06.1997         Original published format: DE 19726409
DE199712641021.06.1997         Original published format: DE 19726410
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9858568
Date:30.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/52]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0991342
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991342
Date:04.10.2001
Language:DE
[2001/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:A47C9/00
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/15]
TitleGerman:SITZ[2000/15]
English:SEAT[2000/15]
French:SIEGE[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase18.11.1999National basic fee paid 
18.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
09.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2001Fee for grant paid
29.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.07.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]DE3324788  (CIECIERSKI WOLF) [A] 1-3,5,11,20-22 * the whole document *
by applicantDE19547964