Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993591

EP0993591 - SENSOR FOR ANGLES OF ROTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.01.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.03.2003  [2003/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZF Luftfahrttechnik GmbH
Flughafen Kassel
34379 Calden / DE
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / POHL, Bernhard
Parksiedlung 13
D-93149 Nittenau / DE
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Zietlow, Karl-Peter
ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG
88038 Friedrichshafen / DE
[2001/37]
Application number, filing date98938664.427.06.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998EP03936
Priority number, dateDE199712831303.07.1997         Original published format: DE 19728313
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9901720
Date:14.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993591
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993591
Date:13.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01D5/347
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/16]
TitleGerman:DREHWINKELSENSOR[2000/16]
English:SENSOR FOR ANGLES OF ROTATION[2000/16]
French:CAPTEUR D'ANGLE DE ROTATION[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase08.10.1999National basic fee paid 
08.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
05.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.11.2001Fee for grant paid
16.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0332244  (DYNAMICS RES CORP [US]) [A] 1,5 * page 2, line 48 - page 3, line 10; figure 1; table 1 *;
 [A]JPS6055805  ;
 [A]GB1498409  (BRITISH AIRCRAFT CORP LTD) [A] 1 * page 1, line 90 - page 2, line 15; figure 1 *;
 [A]JPS57175211  ;
 [A]JPS5746543
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850807), vol. 009, no. 191, Database accession no. (M - 402), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830125), vol. 007, no. 018, Database accession no. (P - 170), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820703), vol. 006, no. 119, Database accession no. (E - 116), [A] 6 * abstract *