Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994952

EP0994952 - PLANT ATP-PHOSPHORIBOSYL TRANSFERASE AND DNA CODING THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.11.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.12.2004  [2004/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Syngenta Participations AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
[2001/13]
Former [2000/17]For:BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE 
Novartis AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
1235 Wien / AT
Inventor(s)01 / FUJIMORI, Ko
1-17-16-202, Miyata-cho
Takatsuki 569-1142 / JP
02 / MIZUTANI, Masaharu
53-60 Katsura-Inui-cho Nishikyo-ku
Kyoto 615-8086 / JP
03 / OHTA, Daisaku
1-27-1 Ohnodai
Osakasayama-589-0023 / JP
[2000/17]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2000/43]
Former [2000/17]Becker, Konrad
Novartis AG Geistiges Eigentum Konzern Patent- und Markenabteilung CH Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date98938705.524.07.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998EP04652
Priority number, dateGB1997001590528.07.1997         Original published format: GB 9715905
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9905286
Date:04.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994952
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/54, C12N15/82, C12Q1/48, C12Q1/68, A01H1/04, A01H5/00
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:PFLANZLICHE ATP-PHOSPHORIBOSYLTRANSFERASE UND DAFÜR KODIERENDE DNA[2000/17]
English:PLANT ATP-PHOSPHORIBOSYL TRANSFERASE AND DNA CODING THEREFOR[2000/17]
French:ATP-PHOSPHORIBOSYL TRANSFERASE VEGETALE ET ADN LA CODANT[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase20.12.1999National basic fee paid 
20.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/17]
10.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/53]
26.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/53]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational searchWO9310139  [ ] (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]);
 [A]WO9426909  (CIBA GEIGY JAPAN LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-35 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0478502  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-35 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9710346  (ISIS INNOVATION [GB], et al) [A] 1-35 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0138508  (PFIZER [US]) [A] 28 * page 37 - page 39 *;
 [X]  - PARMENTIER, Y., ET AL., "A.thaliana transcribed sequence; clone FAFJ09; similar to ATP phosphoribosyltransferase ; E.coli.", EMBL SEQUENCE ACCESSION NO. Z31670, (19940402), XP002083516 [X] 1,24,25 * the whole document *
 [X]  - NEWMAN, T., ET AL., "5620 Lambda-PRL2 Arabidopsis thaliana cDNA clone 113A18T7", EMBL ACCESSION NO. T42357, (19950202), XP002083517 [X] 1,24,25 * the whole document *
 [X]  - NEWMAN, T., ET AL., "26836 Lambda-PRL2 Arabidopsis thaliana cDNA clone 113A18Xp 3'", EMB SEQUENCE ACCESSION NO. AA395039, (19970427), XP002083518 [X] 1,24,25 * the whole document *
 [X]  - VYSOTSKAIA, V.S., ET AL., "Sequence of BAC F21M12 from Arabidopsis thaliana chromosome 1, complete seqeunce", EMBL ACESSION NO. AC000132, (19970319), XP002083519 [X] 1,24,25 * the whole document *
 [X]  - "Probe Polalpha 25.", DATABASE GENESEQ, (19930908), XP002083529 [X] 24,25 * abstract *
 [XL]  - MOFFATT, B.A., ET AL., "A complete cDNA for adenine phosphoribosyltransferase frm Arabidopsis thaliana", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1992), vol. 18, pages 653 - 662, XP002083520 [XL] 24,29 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00020008
 [XA]  - MUNZER, SILVIA ET AL, "Purification and properties of ATP - phosphoribosyl-transferase from wheat germ", RES. PHOTOSYNTH., PROC. INT. CONGR. PHOTOSYNTH., 9TH (1992), VOLUME 4, 91-4. EDITOR(S): MURATA, NORIO. PUBLISHER: KLUWER, DORDRECHT, NETH., XP002083521 [X] 31 * the whole document * [A] 1-30,32-35
 [XA]  - ARAKI K ET AL, "FEEDBACK RESISTANT PHOSPHO RIBOSYL ATP PYRO PHOSPHORYLASE IN L HISTIDINE PRODUCING MUTANTS OF CORYNEBACTERIUM-GLUTAMICUM.", AGRIC BIOL CHEM 38 (11). 1974 (RECD 1975) 2209-2218., XP002083525 [X] 31 * the whole document * [A] 3,32,33
 [XA]  - AMES, B.N., ET AL., "The first step of histidine biosynthesis", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (196107), vol. 236, no. 7, pages 2019 - 2026, XP002084189 [X] 31 * the whole document * [A] 32,33
 [X]  - DALL-LARSEN, T., ET AL., "Dinitrophenol, dicoumarol and pentachlorophenol as inhibitors and parasite substrates in the ATP phosphoribosyltransferase reaction", BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, (1977), vol. 63, Database accession no. 4243, XP002083526 [X] 31 * abstract *
    [] - EUR. J. BIOCHEM., vol. 66, no. 3, pages 443 - 446,
 [PX]  - YAN, X.H., ET AL., "Thlaspi goesingense ATP phosphoribosyltransferase (THG1) mRNA", EMBL SEQUENCE ACCESSION NO. AF003347, (19971216), XP002083522 [PX] 1,24,25 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ALIFANO, P., ET AL., "Histidine biosynthetic pathway and genes: structure regulation and evolution.", MICROBIOLOGICAL REVIEWS, (199603), vol. 60, pages 44 - 69, XP002083523 [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PLA, J., ET AL., "Cloning of the Candida alibiicans HIS1 gene by direct complementation of a C.albicans histidine auxotroph using improved double-ARS shuttle vector", GENE, (1995), vol. 165, pages 115 - 120, XP002083524 [A] 1,28 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(95)00492-O
 [A]  - ASTVATSATURYANTS G V ET AL, "OBTAINING MUTANTS WITH IMPAIRED RETROINHIBITION OF HISTIDINE BIOSYNTHESIS IN ESCHERICHIA-COLI.", BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. BA87, Database accession no. 81662, XP002083528 [A] 22 * abstract *
    [] - GENETIKA 24 (11). 1988. 1928-1934. CODEN: GNKAA5 ISSN: 0016-6758,