EP0995031 - DEVICE FOR INJECTING FUEL INTO A DIESEL ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wartsila France SAS 1, rue de la Fonderie 68100 Mulhouse / FR | [2002/16] |
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states Cummins Wartsila S.A. 1, rue de la Fonderie 68100 Mulhouse / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FROMENT, Jean-Louis 2, rue Turbil F-69003 Lyon / FR | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Nithardt, Roland, et al Cabinet Nithardt & Associés S.A. 14 Boulevard Alfred Wallach B.P. 1445 68071 Mulhouse Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | Nithardt, Roland, et al Cabinet Nithardt & Associés S.A., 14, Boulevard A. Wallach, B.P. 1445 68071 Mulhouse Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98938739.4 | 13.07.1998 | [2000/17] | WO1998FR01524 | Priority number, date | FR19970009196 | 16.07.1997 Original published format: FR 9709196 | FR19980002938 | 06.03.1998 Original published format: FR 9802938 | [2000/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9904160 | Date: | 28.01.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0995031 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0995031 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F02M61/20, F02M47/02, F02M59/36, F02M45/00, F02M45/08 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
F02M45/00 (EP,US);
F02M45/08 (EP,US);
F02M47/02 (EP,US);
F02M47/025 (EP,US);
F02M47/027 (EP,US);
F02M59/366 (EP,US);
F02M61/205 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/17] | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIESELMOTOREN | [2000/17] | English: | DEVICE FOR INJECTING FUEL INTO A DIESEL ENGINE | [2000/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DE COMBUSTIBLE POUR MOTEURS DIESEL | [2000/17] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 16.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.01.2002 | FI | 02.01.2002 | GR | 02.01.2002 | DK | 02.04.2002 | PT | 02.04.2002 | CY | 31.07.2002 | [2004/10] |
Former [2003/46] | AT | 02.01.2002 | |
FI | 02.01.2002 | ||
GR | 02.01.2002 | ||
DK | 02.04.2002 | ||
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 02.01.2002 | |
FI | 02.01.2002 | ||
GR | 02.01.2002 | ||
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 02.01.2002 | |
FI | 02.01.2002 | ||
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | FI | 02.01.2002 | |
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 02.01.2002 | Cited in | International search | [DA]FR2016477 (SOPROMI SOC PROC MODERN INJECT) [DA] 1,4,5,8 * page 1, line 32 - page 4, line 34; figures 1-4 *; | [DA]US4249497 (EHEIM FRANZ [DE], et al) [DA] 1,5 * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 12; figure 1 *; | [DA]US4545352 (JOURDE JEAN-PIERRE [FR], et al) [DA] 1,5 * column 2, line 16 - column 4, line 61; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4741478 (TEERMAN RICHARD F [US], et al) [A] 1,3,4,8,9 * column 3, line 30 - column 11, line 12; figure 1 *; | [DA]DE4236882 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [DA] 1,4 * column 1, line 59 - column 3, line 18; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE4240517 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,3,4,9,10 * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 54; figure . *; | [DA]DE4406901 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [DA] 1,5 * column 1, line 63 - column 3, line 39; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5626119 (TIMMS COLIN T [GB]) [A] 1-4,9,10 * column 1, line 44 - column 3, line 7; figure . *; | [PA]FR2752268 (FROMENT JEAN LOUIS [FR]) [PA] 1,3,4,7-11* the whole document * |