blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1000453

EP1000453 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR POWERING DOWN A RECEIVER, AND ELECTRIC APPARATUS EQUIPPED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.01.2006
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.03.2006  [2006/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SEB S.A.
Les 4 M
Chemin du Petit Bois
69130 Ecully / FR
[N/P]
Former [2005/10]For all designated states
SEB S.A.
Les 4 M, Chemin du Petit Bois
69130 Ecully / FR
Former [2003/21]For all designated states
SEB S.A.
Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois
69130 Ecully / FR
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
MOULINEX S.A.
76 - 78 Ave des Champs Elysées
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / ARROUBI, Mustapha
18, rue des Tilleuls
F-14610 Villons les Buissons / FR
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Kiehl, Hubert, et al
SAS Groupe SEB
Moulinex Département Propriété Industrielle
8 rue du Colonel Rémy
14054 Caen Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/21]Kiehl, Hubert, et al
SAS Groupe SEB Moulinex Département Propriété Industrielle 8 rue du Colonel Rémy
14052 Caen Cedex / FR
Former [2000/20]Busquets, Jean-Pierre
Group Moulinex C.E.R. Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 8 Rue du Colonel Rémy
14052 Caen / FR
Application number, filing date98938742.813.07.1998
[2000/20]
WO1998FR01530
Priority number, dateFR1997000969730.07.1997         Original published format: FR 9709697
[2000/20]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9907054
Date:11.02.1999
Language:FR
[1999/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1000453
Date:17.05.2000
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1000453
Date:09.03.2005
Language:FR
[2005/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.02.1999
ClassificationIPC:H02H7/08
[2000/20]
CPC:
H02H7/0844 (EP); H01H9/548 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/20]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ABSCHALTEN DER VERSORGUNGSSPANNUNG EINER LAST, UND DAMIT AUSGERÜSTETES ELEKTRISCHES GERÄT[2000/20]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR POWERING DOWN A RECEIVER, AND ELECTRIC APPARATUS EQUIPPED THEREWITH[2000/20]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE MISE HORS TENSION D'UN RECEPTEUR, ET APPAREIL ELECTRIQUE AINSI EQUIPE[2000/20]
Entry into regional phase29.02.2000National basic fee paid 
29.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
05.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.01.2005Fee for grant paid
03.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
02.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE3924653  (TELEFUNKEN ELECTRONIC GMBH) [X] 1,3,4,7,10 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 16; figures 1,2 * [Y] 8,9;
 [XY]DE4021559  (TELEFUNKEN ELECTRONIC GMBH) [X] 1,3,6,7,10 * column 2, line 13 - line 65; figure 1 * [Y] 5;
 [XY]DE3144742  (BLACK & DECKER INC) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 5;
 [Y]EP0073943  (GEN ELECTRIC) [Y] 8 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO9323904  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT ;LAMM HUBERT (DE)) [Y] 9 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.