Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970947

EP0970947 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING BUTYRIC ESTER DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.12.2005
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KUNIHIRO, Shigeki
2-550, Sugain, Koderacho
Kanzaki-gun, Hyogo 679-2132 / JP
02 / KANO, Fumihiko
1004, Roiyarukopo Kuriyamacho, 53, Kuriyamacho
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 670-0954 / JP
03 / MORI, Natsuki
44-50, Inaya, Kakogawacho
Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo 675-0034 / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Hubert, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Hubert, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date98938907.720.08.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998JP03686
Priority number, dateJP1997036282112.12.1997         Original published format: JP 36282197
[2000/02]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9931050
Date:24.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970947
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970947
Date:26.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP24.06.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07C253/34, C07C253/14, C07C255/21, // C07C309:17
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/02]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BUTTERSÄUREESTER-DERIVATEN[2000/02]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING BUTYRIC ESTER DERIVATIVES[2000/02]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE DERIVES D'ESTER BUTYRIQUE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase10.09.1999Translation filed 
09.09.1999National basic fee paid 
09.09.1999Search fee paid 
09.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
10.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.11.2004Fee for grant paid
23.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
08.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
03.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE26.01.2005
CH26.01.2005
IT26.01.2005
LI26.01.2005
NL26.01.2005
ES07.05.2005
[2008/16]
Former [2006/22]BE26.01.2005
CH26.01.2005
LI26.01.2005
NL26.01.2005
ES07.05.2005
Former [2006/12]BE26.01.2005
CH26.01.2005
LI26.01.2005
ES07.05.2005
Former [2005/51]BE26.01.2005
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]JPH07500105  ;
 [A]JPH05331128  (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD)