Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1009230

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
CH 
CY 
DE 
DK 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
IE 
IT 
LI 
LU 
MC 
NL 
PT 
SE 
Examination procedure09.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/33]
Entry into regional phase17.02.2000National basic fee paid 
17.02.2000Search fee paid 
17.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200306   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:21.06.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:21.06.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000217
 
Event date:06.11.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A4
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:06.11.2002 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20020920
 
Event date:26.11.2003 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20031010
 
Event date:11.08.2004 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20040201