Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1009230

EP1009230 - NOVEL GENE ENCODING A DNA REPAIR ENDONUCLEASE AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.06.2004
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.08.2004  [2004/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FOX CHASE CANCER CENTER
7701 Burholme Avenue Philadelphia
Pennsylvania 19111 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]For all designated states
FOX CHASE CANCER CENTER
7701 Burholme Avenue
Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19111 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BELLACOSA, Alfonso
516 Kendrick Street
Philadelphia, PA 19111 / US
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth , et al
Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway
GB-London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date98939122.228.07.1998
[2000/25]
WO1998US15828
Priority number, dateUS19970053936P28.07.1997         Original published format: US 53936 P
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9904626
Date:04.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1009230
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999
[2000/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.02.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:A01K67/00, A61K38/46, A61K39/395, C07H21/00, C07K16/18, C07K16/40, C12N9/16, C12N15/12, C12N15/55, C12N15/63, C12Q1/68
[2000/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/25]
TitleGerman:NEUES GEN, DAS FÜR EINE DNA-REPARATUR-ENDONUKLEASE KODIERT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN BENUTZUNG[2000/25]
English:NOVEL GENE ENCODING A DNA REPAIR ENDONUCLEASE AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF[2000/25]
French:NOUVEAU GENE CODANT UNE ENDONUCLEASE DE REPARATION D'ADN ET SES METHODES D'UTILISATION[2000/25]
Entry into regional phase17.02.2000National basic fee paid 
17.02.2000Search fee paid 
17.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/25]
10.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/33]
09.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]  - HILLIER L. ET AL, EMBL, (19961221), Database accession no. AA167425, URL: EBI, XP002212598 [X] 10 * Nts 9-566 of this cDNA show 96,78% identity in 559 nt overlap to nts 529-1083 of SEQ ID NO: 1 of present application. *
 [X]  - HILLIER ET AL, EMBL, (19961215), Database accession no. AA151689, URL: EBI, XP002212599 [X] 10 * Nucleotides 1-501 of this EST show a 98,035 % identity in a 509 nt overlap to nts 2106-1598 of SEQ ID NO: 1 of the present application. *
    [ ] - HILLIER ET AL, GENOME RES., (1996), vol. 6, no. 9, pages 807 - 828
 [X]  - TAKEDA ET AL, EMBL, (19931006), Database accession no. T11408, URL: EBI, XP002212600 [X] 11,12 * Nucleotides 1 to 186 encode for an amino acid sequence which shows 95.161 % identity in a 62 aa overlap to aas 316-377 of SEQ ID NO:2 of the present application. *
    [ ] - TAKEDA ET AL, HUM. MOL. GENET., vol. 2, pages 1793 - 1798
 [X]  - ADAMS ET AL, EMBL, Database accession no. AA317013, URL: EBI, XP002212601 [X] 11,12 * Nucleotides 1 to 162 encode for an amino acid sequence which shows 96,296 % identity in a 54 aa overlap to aas 260-313 of SEQ ID NO:2 of the present application. *
    [ ] - ADAMS ET AL, NATURE, vol. 377, pages 3 - 174
 [A]  - ROCKMILL B ET AL, "THE YEAST MED1 MUTANT UNDERGOES MOTH MEIOTIC HOMOLOG NONDISJUNCTIONAND PRECOCIOUS SEPARATION OF SISTER CHROMATIDS", GENETICS, GENETICS SOCIETY OF AMERICA, AUSTIN, TX, US, (1994), vol. 136, no. 1, ISSN 0016-6731, pages 65 - 74, XP000676804 [A] 27-29 * the whole document *
 [T]  - BELLACOSA A ET AL, "MED1, A NOVEL HUMAN METHYL-CPG-BINDING ENDONUCLEASE, INTERACTS WITHDNA MISMATCH REPAIR PROTEIN MLH1", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (19990330), vol. 96, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3969 - 3974, XP000974415 [T] 1-29

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.7.3969
 [A]  - APPIERTO V ET AL, "Functional characterization of a human DNase-like protein encoded by a gene positioned in Xq28", GENE: AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL ON GENES AND GENOMES, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, (19970325), vol. 188, no. 1, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 119 - 122, XP004115675 [A] 1-29 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(96)00794-9
International search[A]  - LEWIS J. D., ET AL., "PURIFICATION, SEQUENCE, AND CELLULAR LOCALIZATION OF A NOVEL CHROMOSOMAL PROTEIN THAT BINDS TO METHYLATED DNA.", CELL, CELL PRESS, US, US, (19920612), vol. 69., doi:10.1016/0092-8674(92)90610-O, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 905 - 914., XP002914706

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(92)90610-O
 [Y]  - EMBL NUCLEOTIDE SEQU, (19000101), Database accession no. AA011232, XP002914707