blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1003396

EP1003396 - CIGARETTE LIGHTER RECEPTACLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Devens, C. Scott
99 Ronald Court
Ramsey, NJ 07446 / US
For all designated states
Arnott, Robert D.
10661 N.W. 43rd and Court
Coral Springs, FL 33065 / US
[2000/22]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Leonhard, Frank Reimund
Leonhard & Partner
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 09 62
80083 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Leonhard, Frank Reimund, Dipl.-Ing.
Leonhard - Olgemöller - Fricke Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 57
80083 München / DE
Application number, filing date98939179.203.08.1998
[2000/22]
WO1998US16138
Priority number, dateUS1997091049604.08.1997         Original published format: US 910496
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9905934
Date:11.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1003396
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1003396
Date:03.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.02.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2000
ClassificationIPC:A45F3/00, A24F15/18, B65D85/10
[2000/39]
CPC:
B65D85/109 (EP,KR,US); A24F15/18 (EP,US); F23Q2/32 (KR);
F23Q2/36 (KR)
Former IPC [2000/22]A45F3/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
TitleGerman:BEHÄLTER FÜR EIN FEUERZEUG[2000/22]
English:CIGARETTE LIGHTER RECEPTACLE[2000/22]
French:POCHE A BRIQUET[2000/22]
Entry into regional phase03.03.2000National basic fee paid 
03.03.2000Search fee paid 
03.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
31.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.2003Fee for grant paid
11.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
IT03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
IE03.08.2004
LU03.08.2004
PT03.08.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]AT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
IE03.08.2004
LU03.08.2004
Former [2005/46]AT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
IE03.08.2004
Former [2005/18]AT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/05]AT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/01]AT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2004/46]AT03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2004/44]AT03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2004/43]AT03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI03.03.2004
SE03.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]DE9106739U  (SPIEKERS) [X] 1,10 * the whole document *;
 [XA]FR2697139  (FRECHIN JEAN PAUL [FR]) [X] 1,4-6,10 * page 1, line 32 - page 2, line 2; figures 1,2 * [A] 7-9;
 [A]DE29613167U  (KHOA BUI DANG [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *
International search[Y]US1256549  (GOODNOW HENRY W [US]);
 [X]US2349488  (DEMENT CHARLES S);
 [X]US2958416  (CLARK IVALEE M);
 [Y]FR2693878  (TIBI BERNARD [FR]);
 [A]US5630503  (RHODES KENNETH [US], et al)
by applicantUS2349488
 FR1229398
 US2958416
 US4000812
 US4190148
 DE3137318
 US4588076
 FR2693878
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.