Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1003832

EP1003832 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SEPARATING PARTICULATE MATTER FROM A LIQUID SPECIMEN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.12.2004
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LAMINA, INC.
1901 N.Fort Myer Drive, Suite 600
Arlington, VA 22209 / US
[2004/06]
Former [2003/36]For all designated states
LAMINA, INC.
1901 N.Fort Myer Drive, Suite 600
Arlington 22209 / US
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
LAMINA, INC.
Suite 100, 2190 Fox Mill Road
Herndon, VA 20171 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GUIRGUIS, Raouf, A.
9700 Meadowmere Drive
Vienna, VA 22182 / US
02 / EL-AMIN, Marianna
10008 Montauk Avenue
Bethesda, MD 20817 / US
03 / SAMAAN, Nashed
11414 Flowerton Place
Germantown, MD 20876 / US
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Evens, Paul Jonathan , et al
Maguire Boss
24 East Street
St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Evens, Paul Jonathan , et al
Maguire & Co., 5 Crown Street
St. Ives, Cambridge PE17 4EB / GB
Application number, filing date98939244.405.08.1998
[2000/22]
WO1998US16349
Priority number, dateUS19970054799P05.08.1997         Original published format: US 54799 P
US1997096387304.11.1997         Original published format: US 963873
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9907823
Date:18.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1003832
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1003832
Date:04.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12M1/28
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
Extension statesAL03.03.2000
LT03.03.2000
LV03.03.2000
MK03.03.2000
RO03.03.2000
SI03.03.2000
TitleGerman:ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM TRENNEN VON FESTSTOFFEN AUS EINER FLÜSSIGENPROBE[2000/22]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SEPARATING PARTICULATE MATTER FROM A LIQUID SPECIMEN[2000/22]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF SERVANT A SEPARER DES PARTICULES DE MATIERE DEPUIS UN SPECIMEN DE LIQUIDE[2000/22]
Entry into regional phase03.03.2000National basic fee paid 
03.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
22.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.05.2003Fee for grant paid
30.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.02.2004
BE04.02.2004
CY04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
PT04.07.2004
IE05.08.2004
LU05.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]AT04.02.2004
BE04.02.2004
CY04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
IE05.08.2004
LU05.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/46]AT04.02.2004
BE04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
IE05.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/23]AT04.02.2004
BE04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/01]AT04.02.2004
BE04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
Former [2004/46]AT04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
Former [2004/43]AT04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
Former [2004/41]FI04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
Former [2004/40]FI04.02.2004
SE04.05.2004
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9403103  (GUIRGUIS RAOUF A [US]) [X] 2,7,9,16,24 * page 14, line 5 - page 15, line 26; figures 5,7,8 * [Y] 1,7-9,22,25;
 [A]EP0483506  (MICROBYX CORP [US]) [A] 2 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US5422273  (GARRISON DONALD L [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [Y]FR2691977  (NOWZARI DALINI HESSAMEDIN [US], et al) [Y] 1,7-9,22,25 * page 10, line 34 - page 12, line 26; figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]US5624554  (FAULKNER MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 1,7-9,22,25 * column 4, line 57 - line 67; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0471570  (MINA LTD [US]) [A] 2 * figure 1; claim - *;
 [X]EP0448837  (CYTYC CORP [US]) [X] 2,16 * figures 1,2; claim - *