EP1003451 - BRAIN COOLING APPARATUS FOR COOLING THE BRAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/22] | BRAIN COOLING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR COOLING THE BRAIN | ||
[2003/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life Science Holdings, Inc. 1510 West Montana Street Chicago, IL 60614 / US | [2000/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLATZ, Ronald, M. 1510 West Montana Street Chicago, IL 60614 / US | 02 /
GOLDMAN, Robert, M. 1510 West Montana Street Chicago, IL 60614 / US | [2000/22] | Representative(s) | Hill, Richard, et al WILSON GUNN Patent & Trademark Attorneys Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Hill, Richard, et al R.E. Parr & Co., Charles House, 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | ||
Former [2004/20] | Hill, Richard Wilson Gunn Skerrett, Charles House, 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | ||
Former [2000/22] | Parr, Ronald Edward R.E. Parr & Co., Colman House, Station Road Knowle, Solihull, West Midlands B93 0HL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98939326.9 | 10.08.1998 | [2000/22] | WO1998US16619 | Priority number, date | US19970910156 | 13.08.1997 Original published format: US 910156 | [2000/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9908632 | Date: | 25.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1003451 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1003451 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/10 | [2000/22] | CPC: |
A61F7/10 (EP);
A61F2007/0008 (EP);
A61F2007/0056 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2000/22] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM KÜHLEN DES GEHIRNS | [2003/43] | English: | BRAIN COOLING APPARATUS FOR COOLING THE BRAIN | [2003/43] | French: | APPAREIL DE REFROIDISSEMENT DES TISSUS CEREBRAUX | [2003/43] |
Former [2000/22] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KÜHLEN DES GEHIRNS | ||
Former [2000/22] | BRAIN COOLING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR COOLING THE BRAIN | ||
Former [2000/22] | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE REFROIDISSEMENT DES TISSUS CEREBRAUX | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 29.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.12.2002 | 31.08.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   15.01.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 30.06.2004 | LI | 30.06.2004 | [2005/21] | Cited in | International search | [DYA]US5261399 (KLATZ RONALD M ET AL) [DY] 1,16,23,28,33,34 * the whole document * [A] 4-8; | [YA]US4920963 (BRADER ERIC W) [Y] 1,16,23,28,33,34 * abstract * [A] 14,25,30; | [A]US5539934 (PONDER CHRISTOPHER W) [A] 1-3,16,23,24,28,29,33,34 * abstract *; | [A]US4750493 (BRADER ERIC W) [A] 1,23,28 * column 4, line 11 - line 25; claim - *; | [A]DE3039468 (MARX GUENTER H) [A] 1,16,33,34 * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 12 * * page 8, line 15 - line 29 * |