EP0990093 - INDUCTION SYSTEM, ESPECIALLY FOR USE AS AN INDUCTION PORT OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mann + Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2003/51] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states FILTERWERK MANN & HUMMEL GmbH 71631 Ludwigsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPANNBAUER, Helmut Am Hirschgraben 39 D-71640 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Voth, Gerhard Mann+Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Voth, Gerhard Mann+Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | ||
Former [2000/14] | Voth, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. FILTERWERK MANN + HUMMEL GMBH Postfach 4 09 71631 Ludwigsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98939521.5 | 19.06.1998 | [2000/14] | WO1998EP03771 | Priority number, date | DE1997126327 | 20.06.1997 Original published format: DE 19726327 | [2000/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9859166 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0990093 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0990093 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02M35/12, F02B27/02 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
F02M35/10039 (EP,US);
F02M35/12 (KR);
F02M35/10052 (EP,US);
F02M35/1216 (EP,US);
F02M35/1266 (EP,US);
F02M35/10321 (EP,US);
F02M35/1036 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, MC, SE [2000/44] |
Former [2000/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ANSAUGSYSTEM, INSBESONDERE ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS ANSAUGKANAL EINER VERBRENNUNGSKRAFTMASCHINE | [2000/14] | English: | INDUCTION SYSTEM, ESPECIALLY FOR USE AS AN INDUCTION PORT OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2000/14] | French: | SYSTEME D'ASPIRATION, S'UTILISANT NOTAMMENT COMME CANAL D'ASPIRATION D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2000/14] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.01.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 30.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, NL, PT | 20.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.03.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.03.2000 | M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2000 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.09.2006 | SE | 13.12.2006 | ES | 24.12.2006 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/21] | SE | 13.12.2006 | |
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/18] | SE | 13.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3712416 (SWANSON I, et al) [X] 1 * figures 2,3 * * column A * * column 2, line 17 - line 63 * * column 2, line 7 - line 9 * [A] 2-4,6; | [A]US4919086 (SHILLINGTON RONALD G [CA]) [A] 1,2,6 * figure 2 * * column A * * column 3, line 4 - line 12 *; | [A]WO9721024 (VIBRON LIMITED [CA]) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-3 * * abstract * * claims 1-17 *; | [A]US4449607 (FORESTIER ALEXANDRE [FR], et al) [A] 1-4 * figure 1 * * column A * | by applicant | DE3842248 |