Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991876

EP0991876 - MULTI-SPEED GEARBOX, IN PARTICULAR A SIX-SPEED GEARBOX [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  28.09.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2001Refusal of applicationpublished on 14.11.2001 [2001/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Turbo GmbH & Co. KG
Alexanderstrasse 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / STODT, Enno
verstorben / DE
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Application number, filing date98939525.624.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998EP03847
Priority number, dateDE199712715326.06.1997         Original published format: DE 19727153
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900611
Date:07.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991876
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16H3/66, F16H37/04
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:MEHRGANGGETRIEBE, INSBESONDERE SECHSGANG-GETRIEBE[2000/15]
English:MULTI-SPEED GEARBOX, IN PARTICULAR A SIX-SPEED GEARBOX[2000/15]
French:BOITE DE VITESSES MULTIRAPPORT, EN PARTICULIER A SIX VITESSES[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase15.12.1999National basic fee paid 
15.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
29.12.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
13.06.2001Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2001/46]
23.06.2001Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]DE2935361  (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1,3-9,13 * page 5, paragraph 4 * * page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 10, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]GB1459886  (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1,4-7 * column 2, line 95 - line 108 * * page 3, line 40 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US3979973  (KLAUE HERMANN) [A] 1,4 * column 1, line 47 - line 54 * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 41 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]FR2483553  (KLEMENTA GOTTWALDA PRAGA [CS]) [A] 1,8-10,16 * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 11 * * figures 3-8,13-18 *;
 [A]US4046031  (OTT ANTON, et al) [A] 1,8-10,16 * abstract * * column 1, line 46 - line 58 * * figures 4,5 *;
 [A]EP0342672  (U V M V USTAV PRO VYZKUM MOTOR [CS]) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * * column 5, line 10 - line 17 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [DA]DE19514276  (VOITH TURBO KG [DE]) [DA] 1,4-7 * the whole document *