Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1002079

EP1002079 - INHIBITOR OF CELLULAR PROLIFERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/21]NOVEL INHIBITOR OF CELLULAR PROLIFERATION
[2007/46]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.05.2008
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V.
Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/20]For all designated states
Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V.
Berlin / DE
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V.
Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / YOUNG, Craig
Adelgundenstrasse 15
D-80538 Munich / DE
02 / LOTTSPEICH, Friedrich
Peter-Dörfler-Str.4
D-82131 Stockdorf / DE
03 / OTASEK, Adam
Bahnhof Strasse 40
A-4100 Ottensheim / AT
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/21]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98939557.929.06.1998
[2000/21]
WO1998EP03973
Priority number, dateEP1997011066930.06.1997         Original published format: EP 97110669
[2000/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9901551
Date:14.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1002079
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/21]
Search report(s)International search reportEP01.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C12N15/29, C12N15/31, C12N15/86, C12N15/82, C12N15/81, C12N5/10, C12N1/19, C07K14/395, C07K14/47, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/04, A61K38/17, A61K48/00
[2000/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/21]
TitleGerman:ZELLWACHSTUMSHEMMER[2000/21]
English:INHIBITOR OF CELLULAR PROLIFERATION[2007/46]
French:INHIBITEUR DE PROLIFERATION CELLULAIRE[2007/46]
Former [2000/21]NOVEL INHIBITOR OF CELLULAR PROLIFERATION
Former [2000/21]NOUVEL INHIBITEUR DE PROLIFERATION CELLULAIRE
Entry into regional phase19.01.2000National basic fee paid 
19.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
26.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
15.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.01.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/27]
11.02.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
29.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200710   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9625492  (SANDOZ LTD [CH], et al) [X] 21 * table 1 * * page 5 * * claims 1-13 *;
 [AD]  - PARK M.H. ET AL., "Is hypusine essential for eukaryotic cell proliferation?", TIBS, (199312), vol. 18, pages 475 - 479, XP002090456 [AD] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0968-0004(93)90010-K
 [AD]  - KANG H.A. & HERSHEY J.W.B., "Effect of initiation factor eIF-5A depletion on protein synthesis and proliferation of S. cerevisiae", J. BIOL. CHEM., (19940211), vol. 269, no. 6, pages 3934 - 3940, XP002090457 [AD] 1-20 * abstract * * page 3937, column 1 * * figure 4 *
 [A]  - SMIT-MCBRIDE Z. ET AL., "Protein synthesis initiation factor eIF-4D", J. BIOL. CHEM., (19891105), vol. 264, no. 31, pages 18527 - 158318530, XP002090458 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - SCHNIER J ET AL, "TRANSLATION INITIATION FACTOR 5A AND ITS HYPUSINE MODIFICATION ARE ESSENTIAL FOR CELL VIABILITY IN THE YEAST SACCHAROMYCES CEREVISIAE", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (19910601), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 3105 - 3114, XP002005557 [AD] 1-20 * the whole document *