Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994658

EP0994658 - POURABLE EDIBLE AQUEOUS-CONTINUOUS EMULSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  25.03.2011
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 13.07.2011  [2011/28]
Applicant(s)For:DE  ES  FR  IT  NL 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:GB 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
Blackfriars
London
Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/17]For:DE  ES  FR  IT  NL 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House, Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
Former [2000/17]For:DE  ES  FR  IT  NL 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / BIALEK, Jadwiga Malgorzata
Unilever Research Colworth, Colworth House
Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
02 / JONES, Malcolm Glyn
Unilever Research Colworth, Colworth House
Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
03 / NORTON, Ian, Timothy
Unilever Research Colworth, Colworth House
Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Wurfbain, Gilles L. , et al
Unilever N.V.
Unilever Patent Group
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Wurfbain, Gilles L. , et al
Unilever N.V., Patent Division, P.O. Box 137
3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL
Application number, filing date98939580.124.06.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998EP04030
Priority number, dateEP1997030515111.07.1997         Original published format: EP 97305151
GB1997001489815.07.1997         Original published format: GB 9714898
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9902047
Date:21.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994658
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994658
Date:23.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/48, A23L1/24, A23L1/05
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/17]
TitleGerman:FLIESSFÄHIGE WÄSSERIGE KONTINUIERLICHE EMULSIONEN[2002/32]
English:POURABLE EDIBLE AQUEOUS-CONTINUOUS EMULSIONS[2000/17]
French:EMULSIONS AQUEUSES CONTINUES, CONSOMMABLES ET COULANTES[2000/17]
Former [2000/17]FLIESSFÄHIGE WÄAAERIGE KONTINÜIERLICHE EMULSIONEN
Entry into regional phase19.11.1999National basic fee paid 
19.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/17]
23.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.2002Fee for grant paid
04.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.01.2004  04.02.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Friesland Brands B.V.
Blankenstein 142
7943 PE Meppel / NL
Opponent's representative
van Loon, C.J.J.
Vereenigde
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2007/18]
Opponent(s)01  23.01.2004  04.02.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Friesland Brands B.V.
Blankenstein 142
7943 PE Meppel / NL
Opponent's representative
van Loon, C.J.J.
VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Former [2004/12]
Opponent(s)01  23.01.2004   
Friesland Brands B.V.
Blankenstein 142
7943 PE Meppel / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Adrianus Willem
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
27.02.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.08.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.12.2006Date of oral proceedings
12.01.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.01.2007Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
29.01.2010Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/17]
29.01.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition16.03.2007Appeal received No.  T0480/07
22.05.2007Statement of grounds filed
29.01.2010Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
29.01.2010Date of oral proceedings
03.02.2010Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9102463  (GEN FOODS INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 10 * * page 10, lines 19-22 * * page 18, line 32 - page 19, line 12 * * page 27, line 34 - page 28, line 13 * * page 29, line 31 - page 30, line 7 * * claims 1,3-5 *;
 [A]WO9317582  (TESSENDERLO CHEM NV [BE]) [A] 1-13 * examples 6-11; claim - *;
 [A]EP0501758  (HERCULES INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * examples I-III; claim - *;
 [DA]WO9602151  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1-13 * page 7, lines 15-22; claim - *;
 [DA]EP0355908  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1-13 * claim - *