Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993520

EP0993520 - METHOD FOR DEHYDRATING SOLID-BASED LIQUID SUSPENSIONS, SPECIALLY FIBER-BASED SUSPENSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 25.05.2005  [2005/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Andritz AG
Stattegger Strasse 18
8045 Graz / AT
[2000/42]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Andritz Patentverwaltungs-Gesellschaft mbH
Stattegger Strasse 18
8045 Gras / AT
Inventor(s)01 / SBASCHNIGG, Johann
Eichenhaingasse 7s
A-8045 Graz / AT
02 / PETSCHAUER, Franz
Hangstrasse 21
A-8502 Lannach / AT
03 / RECK, Georg
Andritzer Reichsstrasse 79
A-8045 Graz / AT
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Schweinzer, Friedrich
Stattegger Strasse 18
8045 Graz / AT
[2000/16]
Application number, filing date98939587.601.07.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998EP04045
Priority number, dateAT1997000112201.07.1997         Original published format: AT 112297
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9901609
Date:14.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993520
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993520
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:D21F1/80, D21F3/04
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTWÄSSERUNG VON FESTSTOFF-FLÜSSIGKEITSSUSPENSIONEN, INSBESONDERE FASERSTOFFSUSPENSIONEN[2000/16]
English:METHOD FOR DEHYDRATING SOLID-BASED LIQUID SUSPENSIONS, SPECIALLY FIBER-BASED SUSPENSIONS[2000/16]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR DESHYDRATER DES SUSPENSIONS A BASE DE SOLIDES ET DE LIQUIDES, NOTAMMENT DES SUSPENSIONS A BASE DE FIBRES[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase02.12.1999National basic fee paid 
02.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
08.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.06.2002Fee for grant paid
21.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
[2005/21]
Former [2003/14]SE18.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0460638  (TREU BERNT U [FR]) [X] 1,4-6,8 * the whole document * [Y] 3;
 [Y]US4481118  (HEISSENBERGER OTTO [AT], et al) [Y] 3 * column W *;
 [A]EP0511951  (HUYCK AUSTRIA [AT]) [A] 5,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4525241  (LAAPOTTI JORMA [FI]) [A] 8 * column W *;
 [A]WO9711224  (ANDRITZ PATENTVERWALTUNG [AT], et al) [A] * the whole document *;
 [DA]AT402517B  (ANDRITZ PATENTVERWALTUNG [AT]) [DA] * the whole document *