Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993594

EP0993594 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE FILLING HEIGHT OF A PRODUCT IN A TANK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.06.2003
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.08.2003  [2003/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HEUFT SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH
Brohltalstrasse 31-33
56659 Burgbrohl / DE
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / HEUFT, Bernhard
Lindenstrasse 7
D-56659 Burgbrohl / DE
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Gritschneder, Martin , et al
Abitz & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 86 01 09
81628 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Gritschneder, Martin, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09
81628 München / DE
Application number, filing date98939608.003.07.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998EP04103
Priority number, dateDE199712866004.07.1997         Original published format: DE 19728660
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9901722
Date:14.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993594
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01F23/292
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERFASSEN DER FÜLLHÖHE VON FÜLLGUT IN EINEM BEHÄLTER[2000/16]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE FILLING HEIGHT OF A PRODUCT IN A TANK[2000/16]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DETERMINER LA HAUTEUR DE REMPLISSAGE D'UN PRODUIT DANS UN RESERVOIR[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase19.01.2000National basic fee paid 
19.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
03.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/32]
04.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US3120757  (SMITH MILLARD F) [A] 1,4 * claim 1 *;
 [A]BE673295  (CENTRE NATIONAL DE RECHERCHES METALLURGIQUES) [A] 1,4 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US3499154  (BOYD DAVID M) [A] 1,4 * column 4, line 10 - line 28; figure . *;
 [A]US5568262  (LACHAPELLE JOSEPH G [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 7, line 5 - line 42; figures 3-8 *