blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1002290

EP1002290 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRONIC BANKING SHOP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.09.2005
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.11.2005  [2005/45]
23.09.2005Change - representativepublished on 09.11.2005  [2005/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Citicorp Development Center, Inc.
12731 W. Jefferson Boulevard
Los Angeles, California 90066 / US
[2000/21]
Inventor(s)01 / COUTINHO, Sylvia Brasil
Apartment 21B, 400 E. 84th Street
New York, NY 10028 / US
02 / OISHI, Eugene, Susumu
8711 Falmouth Avenue 104
Los Angeles, CA 90293 / US
03 / KHAN, Mohammed, Afzal
5524 Honeyman Street
Simi Valley, CA 96063 / US
04 / HA, Nhut, Trung
604 N. Gramercy Place
Los Angeles, CA 90004 / US
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Johansson, Lars-Erik, et al
Hynell Intellectual Property AB
Hammarbybacken 27
120 30 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2005/45]Johansson, Lars-Erik, et al
Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2
683 40 Hagfors / Uddeholm / SE
Former [2002/51]Johansson, Lars E., et al
Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls Väg 2
683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE
Former [2000/21]Hynell, Magnus
Hynell Patenttjänst AB, Patron Carls väg 2
683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE
Application number, filing date98939864.904.08.1998
[2000/21]
WO1998US15802
Priority number, dateUS19970055035P08.08.1997         Original published format: US 55035 P
US1998005211431.03.1998         Original published format: US 52114
[2000/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9908215
Date:18.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1002290
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.02.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2005
ClassificationIPC:G06F17/60, G07F19/00
[2005/15]
CPC:
G07F19/201 (EP); G06Q40/02 (EP)
Former IPC [2000/21]G06F17/60
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/21]
Extension statesAL08.03.2000
LT08.03.2000
LV08.03.2000
MK08.03.2000
RO08.03.2000
SI08.03.2000
TitleGerman:EIN VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE BANKGESCHÄFTE[2000/21]
English:A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRONIC BANKING SHOP[2000/21]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR SERVICES BANCAIRES ELECTRONIQUES[2000/21]
Entry into regional phase08.03.2000National basic fee paid 
08.03.2000Search fee paid 
08.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
08.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
08.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
01.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/45]
19.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200104   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.2002
31.08.200306   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2004
31.08.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5220501  (LAWLOR ET AL) [X] 1-62,66-74 * column 9, line 5 - column 11, line 42; figures 1,3; claims 22,32 *;
 [X]GB1496984  (DIEBOLD INC) [X] 1-62,66-74 * page 2, lines 14-85; figure 1; claim 6 * * page 2, line 115 - page 4, line 44 *;
 [X]US3876864  (CLARK ET AL) [X] 1,40,53-57,61,62,66,70-74 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 40; figures 1,3; claims 1,15 * * column 6, line 5 - column 7, line 60 *;
 [X]US5590038  (PITRODA ET AL) [X] 1-62,66-74 * column 2, line 44 - column 5, line 42; figures 2-4; claims 6,17 *;
 [X]US5600114  (DUNLAP ET AL) [X] 1,40,53-57,61,62,66,70-74 * column 3, line 18 - column 7, line 29; figures 1,3; claim 2 *
International search[YP]US5774663  ;
 [Y]US5604341  ;
 [Y]US5600114  ;
 [Y]US5537315  ;
 [Y]US4600828
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.