Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1017552

EP1017552 - BUILDING PANEL AND METHOD AND APPARATUS OF FORMING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.05.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BORAL RESOURCES (NSW) PTY LIMITED
Greystanes Road
South Wentworthville, NSW 2145 / AU
[2000/28]
Inventor(s)01 / MOSES, Paul, Russell
91 Burraneer Bay Road
Cronulla, NSW 2230 / AU
02 / MUNN, Robert Lawrence
32 Althone Crescent
Killarney Heights, NSW 2087 / AU
03 / STORY, Robert
Tarrangaua
Lovett Bay, NSW 2105 / AU
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Higgins, Michael Roger
A.R. Davies & Co. 27, Imperial Square Cheltenham
Glos. GL50 1RQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Higgins, Michael Roger
A.R. Davies & Co. 27, Imperial Square
Cheltenham Glos. GL50 1RQ / GB
Application number, filing date98939987.828.08.1998
[2000/28]
WO1998AU00706
Priority number, dateAU1997PO0886429.08.1997         Original published format: AU PO886497
AU1998PP0318124.04.1998         Original published format: AU PP318198
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9911442
Date:11.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1017552
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999
[2000/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1017552
Date:14.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU11.03.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:B28B1/16, E04C2/04, E04C2/30, B28B7/22, B28B7/24, B28B19/00, B32B13/04
[2000/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/28]
Extension statesAL07.03.2000
LT07.03.2000
LV07.03.2000
MK07.03.2000
RO07.03.2000
SI07.03.2000
TitleGerman:BAUPANEEL SOWIE VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG[2000/28]
English:BUILDING PANEL AND METHOD AND APPARATUS OF FORMING SAME[2000/28]
French:PANNEAU DE CONSTRUCTION ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE LE FABRIQUER[2000/28]
Entry into regional phase07.03.2000National basic fee paid 
07.03.2000Search fee paid 
07.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
07.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
06.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.2004Fee for grant paid
07.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200003   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.07.2004
BE14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
CY14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
FR14.07.2004
IT14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
NL14.07.2004
LU28.08.2004
IE30.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK14.10.2004
GB14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
ES25.10.2004
PT14.12.2004
DE01.03.2005
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]AT14.07.2004
BE14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
CY14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
FR14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
NL14.07.2004
LU28.08.2004
IE30.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK14.10.2004
GB14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
ES25.10.2004
DE01.03.2005
Former [2006/32]AT14.07.2004
BE14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
FR14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
NL14.07.2004
IE30.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK14.10.2004
GB14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
ES25.10.2004
DE01.03.2005
Former [2006/24]AT14.07.2004
BE14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
NL14.07.2004
IE30.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK14.10.2004
GB14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
ES25.10.2004
DE01.03.2005
Former [2006/13]AT14.07.2004
BE14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
IE30.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK14.10.2004
GB14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
ES25.10.2004
DE01.03.2005
Former [2006/03]AT14.07.2004
BE14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
IE30.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
ES25.10.2004
DE01.03.2005
Former [2005/46]AT14.07.2004
BE14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
IE30.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
ES25.10.2004
Former [2005/28]AT14.07.2004
BE14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
ES25.10.2004
Former [2005/23]AT14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
ES25.10.2004
Former [2005/22]AT14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
DK14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
Former [2005/21]AT14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
Former [2005/18]AT14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
Former [2005/13]AT14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
SE14.10.2004
Former [2005/11]FI14.07.2004
SE14.10.2004
Former [2005/10]SE14.10.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]FR1424775  (TRAVAUX POUR LA CONSTRUCTION E) [A] 1,5-9,11,12,15,17,18,22 * the whole document * * page 1, column 2, line 37 - page 1, column 2, line 39 *;
 [A]FR2139218  (KLEIBER ARMIN) [A] 1,5,6,9,18,19,22 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0437672  (Z ZA RAZISKAVO MATERIALA IN KO [YU]) [A] 1,5,7,9,13,15,18,20,22 * the whole document *
International search[X]AU7820375  (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG);
 [X]AU6282690  (A C I AUSTRALIA LTD);
 [X]US5209968  (SWEENEY JEFF S [US]);
 [X]GB1278322  (HAYNES HAROLD WALLACE [GB]);
 [X]GB1153281  (DEUTSCHE BAUAKADEMIE [DE]);
 [A]US3809516  (KOMAKI S);
 [A]US4191521  (MULDERY HENDRIKUS [ZA], et al)